This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 10:57:27 (UTC).

Tris Carpenter v. American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36 et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Tris Carpenter filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark C. Scarsi and Karen L. Stevenson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-09743

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark C. Scarsi

Referral Judge

Karen L. Stevenson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tris Carpenter

Defendants

American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36

American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Morgan James Good

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Rancho Cucamonga, CA 91730

Ann Hendrix

Attorney at Myers Law Group APC

9327 Fairway View Place Suite 100

Ranch Cucamonga, CA 91730

Defendant Attorneys

Joshua B Adams

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Michael Eldredge Plank

Attorney at Bush Gottlieb ALC

801 North Brand Boulevard Suite 950

Glendale, CA 91203

Jay Edward Smith

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010-2732

Mitzi Nubia Marquez-Avila

Attorney at Gilbert and Sackman ALC

3699 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

13 #3

Proposed Order

13 #2

Declaration

13 #1

Memorandum

13 #13

Main Document

10 #4

Proof of Service

10 #3

Proposed Order

10 #2

Declaration of Leticia Munguia

10 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

10 #10

Main Document

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTIONS (ECF Nos. #10 and #13 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Mark C. Scarsi: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion to Dismiss Case (ECF No. #10 ) and the Motion to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court (ECF No. #13 ) and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion(s), noticed for hearing on February 7, 2022, have been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) REPLY in support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Plaintiff Tris Carpenter. (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #13 filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36. (Plank, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Tris Carpenter. Motion set for hearing on 2/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Proposed Order) (Good, Morgan) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #10 filed by Plaintiff Tris Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Morgan J. Good, #2 Exhibit A)(Good, Morgan) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters, re Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #7 served on December 28, 2021. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters. Motion set for hearing on 2/7/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Leticia Munguia, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proof of Service) (Attorney Michael Eldredge Plank added to party American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters(pty:dft)) (Plank, Michael) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters, re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #8 served on 12/22/2021. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE MARK C. SCARSI upon filing of the complaint by Judge Mark C. Scarsi. (vv) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tris Carpenter, upon Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36 served on 11/23/2021, answer due 12/14/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Andreas Jung/Agent for Service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/8/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT H) (ghap) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Tris Carpenter, upon Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters served on 11/18/2021, answer due 12/9/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Holly Olsen-Director Admin in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/8/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT G) (ghap) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36, American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters, Does 1 through 10, inclusive. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Tris Carpenter. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 10/29/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36, (Attorney Joshua B Adams added to party American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, District Council 36(pty:dft))(Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters, (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters. (Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV39839 Receipt No: ACACDC-32494038 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Proof of Service) (Attorney Joshua B Adams added to party American Federation of State, County and Municipal Employees, National Headquarters(pty:dft))(Adams, Joshua) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jay Edward Smith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua B. Adams