This case was last updated from PACER on 07/06/2019 at 07:25:40 (UTC).

Carpenter et al v. Ternstrom et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2019 Carpenter filed a Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability lawsuit against Ternstrom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr, Christopher L. Ray and Dudley H. Bowen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00100

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

Presiding Judges

William T. Moore, Jr

Dudley H. Bowen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Maria Ternstrom

Collette Carpenter

Jon Ternstrom

Defendant

Lockheed Martin Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin R. Dean

Attorney at Motley Rice, LLC

28 Bridgeside Blvd.

Mt. Pleasant, SC 29464

Defendant Attorney

Carol P. Michel

Attorney at Weinberg, Wheeler, Hudgins, Gunn & Dial, LLC

3344 Peachtree Rd., Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER reassigning case to the Honorable Dudley H. Bowen, Jr. for further plenary disposition. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/16/2019. (jlh) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

#3

(#3) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/7/19. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#14

(#14) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#12

(#12) Second (Uncontested) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct text (en). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/13/19. (loh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#10

MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings . (jrb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#11) ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/13/19. (loh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (wwp) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Compliance due by 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Forms)(jrb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Submitted. (jrb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #2 Filing fee receipt) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #3 Correct cover sheet) (jrb). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. (wwp) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 7/16/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants reply due by 7/19/2019. (wwp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss . Plsintiff's Response due by 7/2/2019. (wwp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 7/1/19. (wwp) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. (wwp) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Second (Uncontested) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. Responses due by 7/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Dean, Kevin) Modified on 7/1/2019 to correct text (en). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 6/28/2019. (loh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting re #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings as to #8 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 6/13/19. (loh) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings . (jrb) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by Lockheed Martin Corporation. Responses due by 6/18/2019. (Michel, Carol) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER reassigning case to the Honorable Dudley H. Bowen, Jr. for further plenary disposition. Signed by Chief Judge J. Randal Hall on 05/16/2019. (jlh) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Judge Judge Dudley H. Bowen added. Judge Judge William T. Moore, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (jlh) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Lockheed Martin Corporation. (wwp) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number sav035317. (wwp) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • (#5) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (wwp) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Filing Fee Deficiency. Compliance due by 5/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Forms)(jrb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 5/7/19. (jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #1 Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Submitted. (jrb) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Lockheed Martin Corporation, filed by Collette Carpenter, Jon Ternstrom, Maria Ternstrom. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #2 Filing fee receipt) (wwp). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2019: #3 Correct cover sheet) (jrb). (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less