This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/04/2021 at 09:44:13 (UTC).

Carpenter v. Scottsdale Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 Carpenter filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Scottsdale Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00892

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Frank Carpenter

Defendant

Scottsdale Insurance Co

Not Classified By Court

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Special Masters

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Trent Jared Moss

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S I-10 Sevice Rd W Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Galen M Hair

Attorney at Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys

3540 S I-10 Sevice Rd W Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70001

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified docket text on 5/28/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Carpenter. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against Scottsdale Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4630061) filed by Frank Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Trent Jared Moss added to party Frank Carpenter(pty:pla))(aty,Moss, Trent) Modified on 4/6/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Scottsdale Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Co for Scottsdale Insurance Co. (aty,Wolff, John) Modified docket text on 5/28/2021 (Miletello, A). (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Scottsdale Insurance Co.(Attorney John Powers Wolff, III added to party Scottsdale Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Wolff, John) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Frank Carpenter. Scottsdale Insurance Co served on 4/22/2021, answer due 5/13/2021. (aty,Moss, Trent) (Entered: 05/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO.1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Scottsdale Insurance Co. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages against Scottsdale Insurance Co with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4630061) filed by Frank Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Trent Jared Moss added to party Frank Carpenter(pty:pla))(aty,Moss, Trent) Modified on 4/6/2021 to edit text (Dauterive, C). (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Scottsdale Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rae Dietz

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard William Wolff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cole Cisco Frazier