This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/18/2022 at 08:03:07 (UTC).

Carp v. T-Mobile USA Inc ***Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4:21-md-3019.***

Case Summary

On 12/20/2021 Carp filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against T-Mobile USA Inc Do not file in this case - All filings should be made in 4 21-md-3019. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00886

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leon Carp

Defendant

T-Mobile USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher L Springer

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP

801 Garden St Ste 301

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Cari Campen Laufenberg

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Emma Marguerite Wright

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK LLP (WA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Gretchen Freeman Cappio

Attorney at Keller Rohrback L.L.P.

1201 Third Ave., #3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Juli E. Farris

Attorney at KELLER ROHRBACK

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 3200

Seattle, WA 98101-3052

Defendant Attorneys

Kristine McAlister Brown

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP (GA)

1201 W Peachtree St, One Atlantic Ctr

Atlanta, GA 30309-3432

Kathleen M O'Sullivan

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Lauren Jeffers Tsuji

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Steve Y Koh

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

24 #1

*Restricted*

24 #24

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

23 #1

CTO email

23 #23

Main Document

#21

(#21) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher L. Springer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leon Carp (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335222 (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #19 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#19

(#19) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

#18

(#18) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #17 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

#17

(#17) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cari Campen Laufenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emma Marguerite Wright on behalf of Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Wright, Emma) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118-BAT, 21-cv-01119-BJR, 21-cv-01137-RSL, 21-cv-01138-RSL, 21-cv-01139-RAJ, 21-cv-01148-RSL, 21-cv-01153, by Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Farris, Juli) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 8/30/2021. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:21-cv-01130. (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MDL 3019 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1); in re T-Mobile Customer Data Security Breach Litigation; transferred to the Western District of Missouri; assigned to Judge Wimes. (Attachments: #1 CTO email) (LH) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER re #21 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Christopher L Springer for Plaintiff Leon Carp, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Christopher L. Springer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Leon Carp (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7335222 (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #19 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein.(MW) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Stipulated MOTION to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION AND ORDER granting Parties' #17 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SB) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Stipulated MOTION and Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (Koh, Steve) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER re Parties' #13 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer Complaint. The Court orders that the deadline for the Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to 10/18/2021. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (SR) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kristine McAlister Brown for Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Barbara J. Rothstein for all further proceedings, by Judge J Richard Creatura (per related case C21-1119BJR). The Honorable J. Richard Creatura is no longer associated with this matter. (KAM) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gretchen Freeman Cappio on behalf of Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Cappio, Gretchen) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Cari Campen Laufenberg on behalf of Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Laufenberg, Cari) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emma Marguerite Wright on behalf of Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Wright, Emma) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) 21-cv-01118-BAT, 21-cv-01119-BJR, 21-cv-01137-RSL, 21-cv-01138-RSL, 21-cv-01139-RAJ, 21-cv-01148-RSL, 21-cv-01153, by Plaintiff Leon Carp. (Farris, Juli) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Notice of Related Cases Omitted.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 8/30/2021. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant T-Mobile USA Inc. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketJudge J Richard Creatura added. (RE) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) T-Mobile USA, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-7217820) Attorney Juli E. Farris added to party Leon Carp(pty:pla), filed by Leon Carp. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Farris, Juli) [Transferred from wawd on 12/20/2021.] (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Jeffers Tsuji