This case was last updated from PACER on 11/14/2020 at 09:48:00 (UTC).

Carouthers v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 09/15/2020 Carouthers filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Annie T. Christoff and Thomas L. Parker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02705

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Annie T. Christoff

Presiding Judge

Thomas L. Parker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kittice Carouthers

Bartlett, TN 38134

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/22/2020. (kll) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE in re summons by Kittice Carouthers (Attachments: #1 envelope)(agj) (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter from Kittice Carouthers in re issuing summons. (agj) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Thomas L. Parker on 9/22/2020. (kll) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (csf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Administrative track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (csf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Pro Se MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kittice Carouthers. (csf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Social Security Decision against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Kittice Carouthers. (Attachments: #1 Attached Documents, #2 Envelope, #3 Judicial Cards)(csf) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less