This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:05:20 (UTC).

Carol A. Bell v. Chicago Transit Authority et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Other case was filed by Carol A Bell against Chicago Transit Authority in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05651

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Virginia M. Kendall

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carol A. Bell

Defendants

Lars E. Johnson

Chicago Transit Authority

Respondent

United States Attorneys Office

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and Stipulation to Dismiss #8 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by United States Attorneys Office re notice of removal #2 (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018 L 012776) filed by United States Attorneys Office Ex. 1: State court documents (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Transit Authority by Kevin R. Gallardo (Gallardo, Kevin) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#5

(#5) MAILED Removal Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Respondent United States Attorneys Office (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Case is dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) and Stipulation to Dismiss #8 . Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (lk, ) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Chicago Transit Authority by Kevin R. Gallardo (Gallardo, Kevin) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAILED Removal Letter to counsel of record. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Gabriel Fuentes. Case assignment: Random assignment. (jn, ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DESIGNATION of Ernest Yi Ling as U.S. Attorney for Respondent United States Attorneys Office (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by United States Attorneys Office re notice of removal #2 (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2018 L 012776) filed by United States Attorneys Office Ex. 1: State court documents (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ling, Ernest) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.