This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:29:48 (UTC).

CARO v. TRANS UNION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 CARO filed an Other lawsuit against TRANS UNION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is PAUL S. DIAMOND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03071

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PAUL S. DIAMOND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER CARO

Defendants

TRANS UNION, LLC

EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC.

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC

CITIBANK, N.A.

DISCOVER BANK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRENT F. VULLINGS

Attorney at VULLINGS LAW GROUP LLC

3953 Ridge Pike, Ste102

Collegeville, PA 19426

Defendant Attorneys

KARI A. MORRIGAN

Attorney at SCHUCKIT & ASSOCIATES PC

4545 Northwestern Dr

Zionsville, IN 46077

CASEY GREEN

Attorney at SIDKOFF, PINCUS & GREEN, P.C.

1101 Market Street, 2700 Aramark Tower

Philadelphia, PA 19107

MOHAMMAD A. GHIASUDDIN

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

The Curtis Center, Suite 400E, 170 S. Independence Mall, W.

Philadelphia, PA 19106-3337

DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR ANDREWS & INGERSOLL, LLP

1735 Market Street, 51St Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103-7599

MICHAEL FAUSEY

Attorney at BALLARD SPAHR LLP

1735 Market St 51St Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with Certificate of Service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#18

(#18) Statement (Corporate Disclosure) by DISCOVER BANK. (FAUSEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL FAUSEY on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (FAUSEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#16

(#16) Affirmative Defenses by DISCOVER BANK. (MCKENNA, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (MCKENNA, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF KARI A. MORRIGAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/3/2021. 8/3/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#13

(#13) Statement (Corporate Disclosure) by CITIBANK, N.A.. (FAUSEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO re: Allison Rich served Summons and Complaint upon DISCOVER BANK by personal service. DISCOVER BANK served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO re: Rosco Morisco served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/13/2021. 7/13/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO re: Teresa Bailly served Summons and Complaint upon CITIBANK, N.A. by personal service. CITIBANK, N.A. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

1 #3

Designation Form

1 #2

Case Management Track Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CITIBANK, N.A., DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15244638.), filed by CHRISTOPHER CARO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with Certificate of Service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketDisclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by DISCOVER BANK.(SEE PAPER #18 FOR PDF)(md, ) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Statement (Corporate Disclosure) by DISCOVER BANK. (FAUSEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL FAUSEY on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (FAUSEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Affirmative Defenses by DISCOVER BANK. (MCKENNA, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL J.T. MCKENNA on behalf of DISCOVER BANK (MCKENNA, DANIEL) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT THE APPLICATION OF KARI A. MORRIGAN, ESQUIRE, TO PRACTICE IN THIS COURT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 83.5.2(B) IS GRANTED.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 8/3/2021. 8/3/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketDisclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by CITIBANK, N.A.(SEE PAPER #13 FOR PDF)(md, ) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Statement (Corporate Disclosure) by CITIBANK, N.A.. (FAUSEY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice for Kari A. Morrigan, Esquire ( Filing fee $ 40 receipt number APAEDC-15298040.) filed by TRANS UNION, LLC.Certificate of Service.(GREEN, CASEY) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO re: Allison Rich served Summons and Complaint upon DISCOVER BANK by personal service. DISCOVER BANK served on 7/13/2021, answer due 8/3/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO. TRANS UNION, LLC waiver sent on 7/19/2021, answer due 9/17/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO re: Rosco Morisco served Summons and Complaint upon EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. by personal service. EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER OUTLINED HEREIN.SIGNED BY HONORABLE PAUL S. DIAMOND ON 7/13/2021. 7/13/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rt) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC waiver sent on 7/12/2021, answer due 9/10/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHRISTOPHER CARO re: Teresa Bailly served Summons and Complaint upon CITIBANK, N.A. by personal service. CITIBANK, N.A. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. (VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CITIBANK, N.A., DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 7/12/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by CHRISTOPHER CARO. (JL ) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITIBANK, N.A., DISCOVER BANK, EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC., TRANS UNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15244638.), filed by CHRISTOPHER CARO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Case Management Track Form, #3 Designation Form)(VULLINGS, BRENT) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DISCOVER BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CitiBank, N.A. is a litigant