This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2022 at 08:07:50 (UTC).

Carns v. National American Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/18/2022 Carns filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against National American Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeremy D. Kernodle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jeremy D. Kernodle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rick Carns

Defendant

National American Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Luke Frederick Bickham

Defendant Attorney

Karl Wayne Koen

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against National American Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8795404.), filed by Rick Carns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Bickham, Luke) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

#2

(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rick Carns. (Bickham, Luke) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National American Insurance Company. (ndc) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Original Answer & Counter Declaratory Judgment Action ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Koen, Karl) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

4 #1

Exhibit

4 #2

Exhibit

#5

(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/29/2022. (gsg) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

 

Docket Entries

03/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 5/3/2022 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/29/2022. (gsg) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) Original Answer & Counter Declaratory Judgment Action ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Koen, Karl) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/25/2022

DocketDistrict Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (gsg) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National American Insurance Company. (ndc) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Rick Carns. (Bickham, Luke) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against National American Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8795404.), filed by Rick Carns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Bickham, Luke) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less