This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/25/2021 at 09:08:46 (UTC).

Carney v. State of Washington et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 Carney filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against State of Washington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marsha J. Pechman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00415

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marsha J. Pechman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mary M Carney

Defendant / Appellants and Defendants

State of Washington

Swinomish Indian Tribal Community

Washington State Parks and Recreation Commission

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Peter Gellert

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Odin Alonso Smith

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (DC)

700 13Th St Nw Ste 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Jennifer A Maclean

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (DC)

700 13Th St Nw Ste 800

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Defendant / Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Andy Woo

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40100-OLY)

Po Box 40100, 1125 Washington St Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

Wyatt Foster Golding

Attorney at ZIONTZ CHESTNUT

2101 4Th Ave, Suite 1230

Seattle, WA 98121

Emily Rae Hutchinson Haley

Attorney at SWINOMISH INDIAN TRIBAL COMMUNITY

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257

Weston LeMay

Attorney at SWINOMISH INDIAN TRIBAL COMMUNITY

11404 Moorage Way

La Conner, WA 98257

Marc Slonim

Attorney at ZIONTZ CHESTNUT

2101 4Th Ave, Suite 1230

Seattle, WA 98121

John Heidinger

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE (40100-OLY)

Po Box 40100, 1125 Washington St Se

Olympia, WA 98504-0100

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

22 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

#22

21 #1

Proposed Order

#21

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Amended Complaint

1 #1

Complaint

#1

84 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) RESPONSE, by Defendant Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, to #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Golding, Wyatt) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) RESPONSE, by Defendant Washington State Parks and Recreation Commission, to #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Heidinger, John) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff Mary Carney has filed a motion to remand for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction, noted for May 28. (Dkt. Nos. #21 , #22 .) The #10 motion to dismiss is renoted to May 28, as the Court must first ascertain jurisdiction. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (LH) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Second DECLARATION of Karen Mitchell, MS, LG filed by Defendant Swinomish Indian Tribal Community re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Slonim, Marc) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) DECLARATION of Todd Mitchell, MS filed by Defendant Swinomish Indian Tribal Community re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Slonim, Marc) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) REPLY, filed by Defendant Swinomish Indian Tribal Community, TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Slonim, Marc) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) PRAECIPE to attach document re #23 Response to Motion by Plaintiff Mary M Carney (Attachments: #1 Updated Opposition to Motion to Dismiss)(Gellert, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Association of Attorney by John Heidinger on behalf of Defendant Washington State Parks and Recreation Commission. (Heidinger, John) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) DECLARATION of Jennifer A. MacLean filed by Plaintiff Mary M Carney re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Gellert, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) DECLARATION of Walter F. Crampton filed by Plaintiff Mary M Carney re #10 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6)(Gellert, Nicholas) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER re #3 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Odin Alonso Smith for Plaintiff Mary M Carney, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Wyatt Foster Golding on behalf of Defendant Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. (Golding, Wyatt) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Notice of Removal,. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) (Main Document 7 replaced on 3/31/2021 to add additional attorney) (RE) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Skagit County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketJudge Marsha J. Pechman added. (RE) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER re #2 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer A Maclean for Plaintiff Mary M Carney, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Odin A. Smith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mary M Carney (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7017480 (Gellert, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer A. MacLean FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Mary M Carney (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-7017429 (Gellert, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Skagit County Superior Court, case number 21-2-00126-29; (Receipt # AWAWDC-7016049) Attorney Wyatt Foster Golding added to party Swinomish Indian Tribal Community(pty:dft), filed by Swinomish Indian Tribal Community. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Golding, Wyatt) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Swinomish Indian Tribal Community is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer A. MacLean

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Peter Gellert Esquire