This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 10:47:05 (UTC).

Carnate v. Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Carnate filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN GILLMOR and ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00178

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

HELEN GILLMOR

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Paulino M. Carnate

Defendants

Roe "Non Profit" Corporations 1-10

Roe Governmental Entities 1-10

Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC

Doe Corporations 1-10

Doe Partnerships 1-10

Doe Persons 1-10

Hilton Resorts Corporation

Hilton Resorts Corporation doing business as Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ted H.S. Hong

P.O. Box 4217

Hilo, HI 96720

Defendant Attorney

Andrew L. Pepper

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

1088 Bishop Street, Suite- 4100

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#30

26 #3

Certificate of Service

26 #2

Certificate of Compliance

26 #1

Memorandum In Support of Motion

#26

16 #3

Certificate of Service

16 #2

Certificate of Compliance

16 #1

Memorandum In Support of Motion

#16

#6

5 #1

Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement

#5

3 #1

Certificate of Service

#3

#2

1 #2

Certificate of Service

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) EO: On June 26, 2019, Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation filed:DEFENDANT HILTON RESORTS CORPORATIONS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COUNT I (ECF No. #26 ).Plaintiff shall file his Opposition on or before Friday, July 26, 2019.Defendant shall file its Reply on or before Friday, August 9, 2019.The hearing on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I (ECF No. #26 ) is set for Monday, September 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor.The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) (ECF NO. #16 ) is CONTINUED to Monday, September 9, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., at the same time as Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count I. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, ) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REPLY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) filed by Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Errata re #27 Concise Statement of Facts,, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dan Berg, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) CONCISE STATEMENT of Facts re #26 MOTION for Summary Judgment On Count I filed by Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ciera Pope, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Declaration of Andrew L. Pepper, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Declaration of Allyson Meldeau, #10 Declaration of Eduardo "Ed" Andrews, #11 Declaration of Elton Akana, #12 Declaration of Hiram Higashida, #13 Declaration of Adam Smith, #14 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) MOTION for Summary Judgment On Count I Andrew L. Pepper appearing for Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion, #2 Certificate of Compliance, #3 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) filed by Paulino M. Carnate. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Hong, Ted) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) EO: On May 29, 2019, the Court issued a briefing schedule on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Pretext). (ECF No. #20 ).Plaintiff Paulino M. Carnate was to file his Opposition on or before Thursday, June 13, 2019. The hearing was set for July 1, 2019.At the request of Plaintiff, on June 5, 2019, the Court continued the hearing date from July 1, 2019 to July 18, 2019. The Court did not alter the briefing schedule deadlines. Plaintiff did not file an Opposition by June 13, 2019.On June 20, 2019, Defendant filed a Reply. (ECF No. #23 ).The Court CONTINUES the briefing schedule as follows:Plaintiff shall file his Opposition on or before Thursday, June 27, 2019.Defendant may file an additional Reply on or before Friday, July 5, 2019.The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) remains set for Thursday, July 18, 2019, at 10:30 a.m., before the Honorable Helen Gillmor. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, ) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REPLY re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Count III (Pretext) filed by Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) EO: The Court grants Plaintiff's request, the hearing on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. #16 ) previously set for 7/1/2019 is hereby CONTINUED to Thursday, July 18, 2019 at 10:30 AM before JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. (JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR)(rls, ) (Entered: 06/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REQUEST to reschedule the hearing, scheduled for July 1, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. by Paulino M. Carnate. (Hong, Ted) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons (Proposed) (Hong, Ted) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Paulino M. Carnate. (Hong, Ted) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC, Hilton Resorts Corporation dba Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC filed by Paulino M. Carnate. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Trial by Jury)(Hong, Ted) Modified on 4/30/2019 (emt, ). (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Hilton Resorts Corporation. (Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT of Planning Meeting (Joint). (Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 5/13/2019 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 19-00178 HG-RT on all further pleadings.(jo) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Hilton Grand Vacations Borrower, LLC, Corporate Parent Hilton Resorts Corporation for Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC. (Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC from Circuit Court of the Third Circuit, case number 19-1-067K. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2182904), filed by Hilton Grand Vacations Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Pepper, Andrew) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Roe Governmental Entities 1-10 is a litigant

Latest cases where Roe Companies 8-15 is a litigant

Latest cases where HILTON GRAND VACATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Hilton Resorts Corporation is a litigant