This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/13/2020 at 13:44:20 (UTC).

Carmody v. MediaNews Group, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2020 Carmody filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against MediaNews Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01056

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Carmody

Defendant

MediaNews Group, Inc.

Interested Party

Richard P Liebowitz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard P. Liebowitz

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza, Suite 305

Valley Stream, NY 11580-6111

Defendant Attorney

Ashley I. Kissinger

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP-Denver

1225 Seventeenth Street, Suite 2300

Denver, CO 80202-5596

Interested Party Attorney

Michael T. McConnell

Attorney at McConnell Van Pelt LLC

4700 South Syracuse Street, Denver Corporate Center, Tower I, Suite 200

Denver, CO 80237-2710

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit A

#19

18 #5

Exhibit

18 #4

Exhibit

18 #3

Exhibit

18 #2

Exhibit

18 #1

Exhibit

#18

#17

#6

#5

4 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#4

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2020
  • Docket(#20) Civil Case Terminated pursuant to Minute Order #16. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE by Plaintiff Bryan Carmody (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE to 14 ADVISORY Notice to Attorney(s), by Interested Party Richard P Liebowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McConnell, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael T. McConnell on behalf of Richard P LiebowitzAttorney Michael T. McConnell added to party Richard P Liebowitz(pty:ip) (McConnell, Michael) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff has filed a #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), which requires no further action on the part of the Court. The Clerk of Court shall close this case. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/9/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case and Notice of Settlement by Plaintiff Bryan Carmody (Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 06/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • Docket(#14) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: An Order of Disbarment was entered against RICHARD P. LIEBOWITZ by the Northern District of California. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(c), the clerk of this court shall make a notation in the court record of such lack of good standing and hereby informs counsel and the court of counsel's ineligibility to practice before the court. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER re: #11 Notice of Settlement filed by MediaNews Group, Inc. In light of the Notice of Settlement, the Scheduling Conference is VACATED. The parties shall file their Dismissal Papers by 6/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc1) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. MediaNews Group, Inc. answer due 6/10/2010. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/28/2020. Text Only Entry(skclc1) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant MediaNews Group, Inc. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant MediaNews Group, Inc.. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 7/6/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/29/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #6 ) is due 6/29/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/4/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, ) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant MediaNews Group, Inc.. MediaNews Group, Inc. answer due 5/27/2010. (Kissinger, Ashley) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ashley I. Kissinger on behalf of MediaNews Group, Inc.Attorney Ashley I. Kissinger added to party MediaNews Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Kissinger, Ashley) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1056-SKC (angar, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MediaNews Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7251453)Attorney Richard P. Liebowitz added to party Bryan Carmody(pty:pla), filed by Bryan Carmody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Liebowitz, Richard) (Entered: 04/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MediaNews Group, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael T. McConnell