This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/17/2020 at 09:36:55 (UTC).

Carmelita Estrada v. Prosper Marketplace, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Carmelita Estrada filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Prosper Marketplace, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Sheri Pym. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-01663

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmelita Estrada

Defendants

TransUnion, LLC

Prosper Marketplace, Inc.

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stanley Robert Apps

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert S Gitmeid PC

11818 Moorpark Street No R

Studio City, CA 91604

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin L Marker

Attorney at Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett and Moser PC

6900 North Dallas Parkway Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

Pamela C Acebo

Attorney at Jones Day

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92612-4408

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Marker, Kristin) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada, upon Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC, identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Marker, Kristin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC.(Attorney Kristin L Marker added to party TransUnion, LLC(pty:dft))(Marker, Kristin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

7 #2

Proposed Summons on Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

7 #1

Proposed Summons on TransUnion, LLC

#7

(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons on TransUnion, LLC, #2 Proposed Summons on Experian Information Solutions, Inc.)(Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#6

(#6) Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada, identifying Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid, P.C.; Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid & Associates, PLLC. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Pamela C Acebo added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Acebo, Pamela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC. (Marker, Kristin) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada, upon Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc. served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC, identifying TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc.. (Marker, Kristin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant TransUnion, LLC.(Attorney Kristin L Marker added to party TransUnion, LLC(pty:dft))(Marker, Kristin) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Prosper Marketplace, Inc. ONLY filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc., identifying Experian plc; Central Source LLC; Online Data Exchange LLC; New Management Services LLC; VantageScore Solutions LLC; Opt-Out Services LLC. (Acebo, Pamela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Attorney Pamela C Acebo added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Acebo, Pamela) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada, upon Defendant TransUnion, LLC served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada, upon Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons returned. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant TransUnion, LLC. (lom) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (lom) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons on TransUnion, LLC, #2 Proposed Summons on Experian Information Solutions, Inc.)(Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice to counsel re consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge Eastern Division Blackout Case. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (ghap) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada, identifying Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid, P.C.; Law Offices of Robert S. Gitmeid & Associates, PLLC. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada. (Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27675852 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Carmelita Estrada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Stanley Robert Apps added to party Carmelita Estrada(pty:pla))(Apps, Stanley) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prosper Marketplace, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where TransUnion Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stanley Robert Apps