This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/22/2021 at 16:12:42 (UTC).

Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries v. 3M Company

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller and Robert A. Molloy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judge

Robert A. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries

Defendants

3M Company

VIACOMCBS Inc. (f/k/a CBS Corporation, f/k/a VIACOM, Inc. successor-by-merger with CBS Corporation f/k/a Westinghouse Electric Corporation), a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business

Hess Oil Virgin Island Corp., a U.S. Virgin Islands Corporation with is principal place of business in New York

Flowserve US, Inc. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Edward Valves), a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Texas

Eagleburgmann Industries LP (sued individually and as successor-in interest to Burgmann Packings America, Inc. f/k/a Burgmann Seals America, Inc., successor-in-interest to Burgmann Seals America, Inc.

Overseas Shipholding Group, Inc., a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Florida

Hess Oil New York Corp., a New York Corporation withs principal place of business in the State of New York

Parkerhannifin Corporation (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Sacoma-Sierra, Inc.), an Ohio Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Ohio

Air and Liquid Systems Corporation (sued individually and as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), a Pennsylvania Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Pennsylvania

Goulds Pumps LLC f/k/a Goulds Pumps Incorporated, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New York

Hess Corp, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New York

Crane Co. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest as Chapman Valve Co.), a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Connecticut

FMC Corporation (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Northern Pump Company and as successor-in-interest to J.S. Coffin Pump Company), a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of b

General Electric Company, a New York Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Massachusetts

Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New Jersey

3M Company f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Minnesota

Foster Wheeler LLC, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New Jersey

Parker-Hannifin Corporation ( sued individually and as sucessor-in-interest toSacoma-Sierra, Inc.

A.W. Chesterton Company, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Massachusetts

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan W. Greene

15-B Norre Gade, P.O. Box 1197

St. Thomas, VI 00804

Defendant Attorneys

Sofia L Mitchell

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart,LLC

1336 Beltjen Rd, Tunick Building Suite 2011

St Thomas, VI 00802

Simone D. Francis

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Law Firm

1336 Beltjen Road, Thr Tunick Building Suite 201

St. Thomas, VI 00802

Richard H. Hunter

Attorney at Hunter, Cole & Bennett

Pentheny Bldg., 3Rd Fl., 1138 King Street, Suite 301

Christiansted, VI 00820

Joseph T. Hanlon

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Drive, Ste 4Th Fl.

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Robert J. Kuczynski

Attorney at Law Office Of Beckstedt & Associates

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820

Carl A Beckstedt, III

Attorney at Beckstedt and Associate

2162 Church Street

Christiansted, VI 00820-4604

Carolyn F. O'Connor

Attorney at Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Drive, Ste 4Th Fl.

Florham Park, NJ 07932

Mark Wilczynski

Attorney at Law Office of W. Mark Wilczynski, P.C.

P.O. Box 1150

St. Thomas, VI 00804

 

Court Documents

45 #7

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

45 #6

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - TX Supreme Ct.

45 #5

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Texas Bar

45 #4

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - PA

45 #3

Exhibit Declaration of Charles Siegel, Esq.

45 #2

Exhibit Declaration of Ryan W. Greene, Esq.

45 #1

Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Siegel

#45

#44

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Charles S. Siegel(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-941793) by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Siegel, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan W. Greene, Esq., #3 Exhibit Declaration of Charles Siegel, Esq., #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - PA, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Texas Bar, #6 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - TX Supreme Ct., #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION Hess & HONYC'S Motion for Leave to Attend July 15, 2021 Rule 16 Conference Telephonically by Defendants Hess Corp, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New York, Hess Oil New York Corp., a New York Corporation withs principal place of business in the State of New York. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (O'Connor, Carolyn) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney: Michael Armitage(paid $250 PHV fee; receipt number AVIDC-940221) by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Armitage, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Ryan W. Greene, Esq., #3 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Armitage, Esq., #4 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of CA, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of LA, #6 Text of Proposed Order Order (proposed)) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: A proposed order was not filed as an attachment to the motion. Filer is advised to file a proposed order using the event Notice of Filing with the propose order as an attachment to the notice and to link the document to the motion Re: #37 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (W, K) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Opposition to Motion re #15 First MOTION for Joinder Joinder in 3M Mtn for Judgment on Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MEMORANDUM in Support re #37 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Plaintiffs' Mtn for Remand [Doc. #38] by Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries re #38 Memorandum in Support to Motion, (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) MEMORANDUM in Support re #15 First MOTION for Joinder Joinder in 3M Mtn for Judgment on Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Carmela Susino on her own behalf and on behalf of the Estate of Decedent, Luciano Susino and his beneficiaries. (Greene, Ryan) (Entered: 05/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Hess Corp, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New York, Hess Oil New York Corp., a New York Corporation withs principal place of business in the State of New York re #1 Notice of Removal, (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A Beckstedt, III on behalf of Defendants Hess Corp, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of New York, Hess Oil New York Corp., a New York Corporation withs principal place of business in the State of New York (Beckstedt, Carl) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant 3M Company f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Minnesota. (Francis, Simone) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant 3M Company f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Minnesota. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Francis, Simone) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by 3M Company f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, a Delaware Corporation with its principal place of business in the State of Minnesota. (Francis, Simone) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by General Electric Company. (Hunter, Richard) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Richard H. Hunter on behalf of Defendant General Electric Company (Hunter, Richard) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sofia L Mitchell on behalf of Defendant 3M Company (Mitchell, Sofia) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Simone D. Francis on behalf of Defendant 3M Company (Francis, Simone) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Defendant 3M Company from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, case number ST-2021-CV-00098. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AVIDC-931859)filed by 3M Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Francis, Simone) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HESS OIL VIRGIN ISLANDS CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where VIACOMCBS INC. FKA CBS CORPORATION A DELAWARE CORPORATION FKA VIACOM INC. SUCCESSOR BY MERGER TO CBS CORPORATION F/K/A WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION AS SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BF STURTEVANT is a litigant

Latest cases where FMC CORPORATION FKA NORTHERN FIRE APPARATUS COMPANY FKA CHICAGO PUMP COMPANY FKA PEERLESS PUMP COMPANY is a litigant