This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/30/2022 at 13:59:48 (UTC).

Carmela Rogers et al v. Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 Carmela Rogers filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Lawndale Healthcare Wellness Centre, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03922

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carnel Rogers

Carmela Rogers

Defendants

Brius, LLC

Ensemble Healthcare, LLC

Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC

Pacific Wellness GP, LLC

Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP

Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC

DOES 1-50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dawn Marie Smith

Defendant Attorney

David Zarmi

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#8

#9

#11

#13

#14

#16

 

Docket Entries

06/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STAYING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This action is stayed pending the Ninth Circuit's decision in the above-referenced case. The scheduling conference set for July 8, 2021, is vacated pending further order of the court. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (iv) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/25/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Remand #10 is taken off the 7/1/2021 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 7/1/2021. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/25/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) DECLARATION of David Zarmi in opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Brius, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC. (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) OPPOSITION Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendants Brius, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC. (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#12) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #5 is taken off the 6/17/2021 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 6/17/2021. An order with the court's ruling will issue.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carmela Rogers, identifying Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Brius, LLC; Ensemble Healthcare, LLC; Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP; Pacific Wellness GP, LLC. (Smith, Dawn) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiff Carmela Rogers. Motion set for hearing on 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Proposed Order) (Smith, Dawn) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 filed by Defendants Brius, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC. (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/28/2021

Docket(#7) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 05/28/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) DECLARATION of David Zarmi - in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #5 filed by Defendants Brius, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Zarmi, David) (Entered: 05/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Brius, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC, Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 6/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum) (Zarmi, David) (Entered: 05/16/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/12/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: The Civil Cover Sheet and Notice of Interested Parties were incorrectly filed as attachments. Please utilize CM/ECF resources such as the search tool to locate the appropriate events for filing. No further action is required unless directed by the Court. (jtil) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021

DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Carmela Rogers, Carnel Rogers in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/7/2021, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 05/11/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/10/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV13152 Receipt No: ACACDC-31264794 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC, Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP, Pacific Wellness GP, LLC, Brius, LLC, Ensemble Healthcare, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Supplement, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney David Zarmi added to party Brius, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Ensemble Healthcare, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Granite Hills Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Lawndale Healthcare & Wellness Centre, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Pacific Rehabilitation & Wellness Centre, LP(pty:dft), Attorney David Zarmi added to party Pacific Wellness GP, LLC(pty:dft))(Zarmi, David) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less