This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2019 at 08:10:46 (UTC).

Carmel Capital, LLC v. Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2019 Carmel Capital, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Amos L. Mazzant, III and Kimberly C Priest Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00725

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carmel Capital, LLC

Defendants

W. Harry Ridge, III

Plano, TX 75093

Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC

Metroplex Capital Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Sean Nean Hsu

Attorney at Janik Vinnakota LLP

8111 Lbj Freeway, Suite 790

Dallas, TX 75251

Rajkumar Vinnakota

Attorney at Janik Vinnakota LLP

8111 Lbj Freeway, Suite 790

Dallas, TX 75251

Glenn Edward Janik

Attorney at Janik Vinnakota LLP

8111 Lbj Freeway, Suite 790

Dallas, TX 75251

 

Court Documents

12 #2

Envelope(s)

12 #1

Cover letter

#12

(#12) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #11 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope(s))(baf, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

11 #3

Envelope(s)

11 #2

Supplement

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W. Harry Ridge, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement, #3 Envelope(s))(baf, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Metroplex Capital Corporation served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. W. Harry Ridge, III served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2019. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#6

(#6) Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to W. Harry Ridge, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7464801.), filed by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Additional Attachments to Main Document: #11 Answer to Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope(s))(baf, ) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by W. Harry Ridge, III. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Supplement, #3 Envelope(s))(baf, ) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Metroplex Capital Corporation served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. W. Harry Ridge, III served on 10/10/2019, answer due 10/31/2019. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carmel Capital, LLC. Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC served on 10/7/2019, answer due 10/28/2019. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF REFERRAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Local Rules of this Court for the Assignment of Matters to Magistrate Judges, the Court hereby REFERS the above-referenced case to the Hon. Kimberly C. Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/7/2019. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Filing of Copyright Form (AO 121). AO 121 mailed to the Register of Copyrights. (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued as to W. Harry Ridge, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Metroplex Capital Corporation. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Progressive Real Estate Solutions LLC. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Case Assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (rpc, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Carmel Capital, LLC (Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7464801.), filed by Carmel Capital, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Janik, Glenn) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less