This case was last updated from PACER on 12/19/2020 at 09:50:22 (UTC).

Carlton Mario Sims v. Billy Edwin Bowden

Case Summary

On 10/20/2020 Carlton Mario Sims filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Billy Edwin Bowden. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Valerie Baker Fairbank and Patricia Donahue. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09617

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Valerie Baker Fairbank

Referral Judge

Patricia Donahue

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlton Mario Sims

San Luis Obispo, CA 93405

Defendant

Billy Edwin Bowden

 

Court Documents

5 #2

Copy of the November 9, 2020 Order

5 #1

Memorandum

#5

(#5) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Re-Submit the IFP Application and Complaint by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The Court grants Plaintiff a 30-day extension of time, until January 15, 2021, to re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, along with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If Plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Copy of the November 9, 2020 Order) (hr) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES, #2 by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (shb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Carlton Mario Sims. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendant Billy Edwin Bowden pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, filed by plaintiff Carlton Mario Sims. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order Granting Plaintiff an Extension of Time to Re-Submit the IFP Application and Complaint by Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. The Court grants Plaintiff a 30-day extension of time, until January 15, 2021, to re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, along with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If Plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Copy of the November 9, 2020 Order) (hr) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES, #2 by Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank: IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is: DENIED, with leave to amend within 30 days. Plaintiff may re-submit the IFP application and Complaint to this Court, if submitted with the Certified Trust Account Statement and Disbursement Authorization. Plaintiff shall utilize the same case number. If plaintiff fails to submit the required documents within 30 days, this case shall be DISMISSED. (shb) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Carlton Mario Sims. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against defendant Billy Edwin Bowden pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Valerie Baker Fairbank and referred to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue, filed by plaintiff Carlton Mario Sims. (esa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less