This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2019 at 07:28:59 (UTC).

Carlson v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs

Case Summary

On 07/30/2019 Carlson filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against U S Department of Veterans Affairs. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen B. Jackson, Jr and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ms. Holly Carlson

Holly Carlson

Defendants

Administrator Robert Wilkie

U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frederick Adam Sinkevich

Attorney at SINKEVICH LAW FIRM PLLC

309 Court Avenue, Suite 230

Des Moines, IA 50309

Michael Ajiawung Fondungallah

Attorney at FONDUNGALLAH & KIGHAM, LLC

2499 Rice Street, Suite 145

Saint Paul, MN 55113

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3897372 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Holly Carlson. (Fondungallah, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holly Carlson. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Sinkevich, Frederick) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #1

Exhibit DAB Decision Letter

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Holly Carlson against Robert Wilkie Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3881809., filed by Holly Carlson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DAB Decision Letter)(Sinkevich, Frederick) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) TEXT ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael Fondungallah. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr on 8/16/2019. (slg) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-3897372 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Holly Carlson. (Fondungallah, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Holly Carlson. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs served on 8/7/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. (Sinkevich, Frederick) (Entered: 08/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. (kmc) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Holly Carlson against Robert Wilkie Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3881809., filed by Holly Carlson. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 10/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DAB Decision Letter)(Sinkevich, Frederick) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less