This case was last updated from PACER on 08/02/2020 at 10:55:18 (UTC).

Carlson v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Carlson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00847

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lindsay Carlson

Defendant

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Clinton Lee Tapper

Attorney at TAYLOR & TAPPER ATTORNEYS

542 Lawrence St

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant Attorney

Douglas F Foley

Attorney at FOLEY SAMPSON NICHOLES PLLC

13115 Ne 4Th Street, Ste 260

Vancouver, WA 98684

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas F Foley on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Clinton Lee Tapper. Filed by Plaintiff Lindsay Carlson. (Tapper, Clinton) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

1 #2

Summons proposed

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378688), filed by Lindsay Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons proposed)(Tapper, Clinton) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 8/13/2020, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 7/30/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/6/2020. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (LW) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas F Foley on behalf of Defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Foley, Douglas) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (RE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Clinton Lee Tapper. Filed by Plaintiff Lindsay Carlson. (Tapper, Clinton) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendant(s) State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6378688), filed by Lindsay Carlson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons proposed)(Tapper, Clinton) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less