This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:37:14 (UTC).

Carlson et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Carlson filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jared C. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00654

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jared C. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brad Carlson

Jennifer Carlson

Defendant

Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Nord

Attorney at SAGE LAW PARTNERS LLC

140 N Union Ave Ste 220

Farmington, UT 84025

Defendant Attorneys

Mark L. Anderson

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Alan Keith Beal

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Samantha E. Wilcox

Attorney at GOEBEL ANDERSON PC

405 S Main St Ste 200

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2022. Motions due by 10/7/2022. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/16/21. (alf) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#10

(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiffs Brad Carlson, Jennifer Carlson per #9 Attorney Planning Meeting Report. (mh) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

#9

(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Nord, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

7 #5

Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification

7 #4

Notice of Removal

7 #3

Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification

7 #2

Notice of Service

7 #1

Complaint

#7

(#7) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiffs Brad Carlson, Jennifer Carlson. Form due by 11/18/2021. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (nmt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance.(Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 210905665, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4154499) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/31/2022. Motions due by 10/7/2022. See order for other dates and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 11/16/21. (alf) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiffs Brad Carlson, Jennifer Carlson per #9 Attorney Planning Meeting Report. (mh) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Nord, Ryan) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiffs Brad Carlson, Jennifer Carlson. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Notice of Service, Notice of Removal and applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Service, #3 Complaint and Notice of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #4 Notice of Removal, #5 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance, Plaintiffs Brad Carlson, Jennifer Carlson. Form due by 11/18/2021. (alf) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (nmt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance identifying The Allstate Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance.(Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court, Salt Lake County, case number 210905665, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4154499) filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett (Wilcox, Samantha) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett. Defendant Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 11/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark L. Anderson