This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/03/2021 at 08:22:53 (UTC).

Carlsen v. Tribune Publishing Company et al

Case Summary

On 05/04/2021 Carlsen filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Tribune Publishing Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02485

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raymond Carlsen

Defendants

Christopher Minnetian

Randall D. Smith

Dana Goldsmith Needleman

Richard Reck

Tribune Publishing Company

Terry Jimenez

Philip G. Franklin

Carol Crenshaw

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Sadeh

Attorney at Halper Sadeh LLP

667 Madison Avenue, Ste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Carlsen (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Carol Crenshaw, Philip G. Franklin, Terry Jimenez, Christopher Minnetian, Dana Goldsmith Needleman, Richard Reck, Randall D. Smith, Tribune Publishing Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14437877 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Raymond Carlsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated as per plaintiff's Rule 41(a) notice. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/17/2021. (Cogan, Brian) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Raymond Carlsen (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketSCHEDULING ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan for a telephonic Initial Status Conference on 6/22/2021 at 10:45 am. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 2485#. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to notify all attorneys in this action of the conference schedule in writing. Counsel is directed to review Judge Cogan's Individual Practices, which may be obtained on the Court's website at https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/content/judge-brian-m-cogan. Requests for adjournment of the conference will be considered only if made in writing and otherwise in accordance with Judge Cogan's Rules. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/5/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Carol Crenshaw, Philip G. Franklin, Terry Jimenez, Christopher Minnetian, Dana Goldsmith Needleman, Richard Reck, Randall D. Smith, Tribune Publishing Company filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14437877 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Raymond Carlsen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRIBUNE PUBLISHING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Sadeh