This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 08:08:22 (UTC).

Carlos Marsh v. Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 Carlos Marsh filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06877

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald S.W. Lew

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Marsh

Defendants

Does 1-10

Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Lockhart Seabock

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Raymond George Ballister, Jr

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Dennis Jay Price, II

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Russell C Handy

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Elliott Charles Montgomery

Attorney at Center for Disability Access

8033 Linda Vista Road Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Sammy Zreik

Attorney at Whitbeck Kooshki and Zreik LLP

21515 Hawthorne Boulevard Suite 1130

Torrance, CA 90503

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) STATEMENT re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22), #15 . (Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Carlos Marsh. Filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Carlos Marsh(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#15

(#15) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: granting #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. This case is referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 2. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 7 days prior to expiration of 90 day stay. See order for further details. (lom) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zreik, Sammy) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC, (Attorney Sammy Zreik added to party Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC(pty:dft))(Zreik, Sammy) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh, upon Defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe -working at check cashing store in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

11 #1

Proof of Service

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Constitutional Question filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

10 #5

Proof of Service

10 #4

Exhibit 3

10 #3

Exhibit 2

10 #2

Exhibit 1

10 #1

Declaration

#10

(#10) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marshto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#9

(#9) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE EXERCISE OF SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION RE STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplementaljurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and all other state law claims asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than August 12, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the dismissal of those claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (shb) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#8

(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation (early mediation and stay program). (jre) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STATEMENT re: Order on Application to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-22), #15 . (Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Elliott Montgomery on behalf of Plaintiff Carlos Marsh. Filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh (Attorney Elliott Charles Montgomery added to party Carlos Marsh(pty:pla))(Montgomery, Elliott) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew: granting #14 APPLICATION to Stay Case re Early Mediation ADA Disability Access Litigation as to All Defendants. This case is referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 2. The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: 7 days prior to expiration of 90 day stay. See order for further details. (lom) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST to Stay Case and Early Mediation re ADA Disability Access Litigation, filed by Defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Zreik, Sammy) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC, (Attorney Sammy Zreik added to party Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC(pty:dft))(Zreik, Sammy) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh, upon Defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC served on 8/20/2020, answer due 9/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jane Doe -working at check cashing store in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Constitutional Question filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marshto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Order to Show Cause,, #9 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Proof of Service)(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE EXERCISE OF SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION RE STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplementaljurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and all other state law claims asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than August 12, 2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the dismissal of those claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (shb) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation (early mediation and stay program). (jre) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Ahmad Cahla Plaza LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Carlos Marsh. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh, (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Carlos Marsh. (Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27440506 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Carlos Marsh. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Carlos Marsh(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less