This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2021 at 19:27:44 (UTC).

Carlos Chavez v. Schlumberger Technology Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Carlos Chavez filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Schlumberger Technology Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04817

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carlos Chavez

Defendants

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Timothy Ramey

Does 1 through 100 inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric A Panitz

Attorney at Panitz Law Group APC

18000 Studebaker Road Suite 700

Cerritos, CA 90703

Defendant Attorney

Heather D Hearne

Attorney at Kullman Firm APC

4605 Bluebonnet Boulevard Suite A

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #10 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. The action is REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Although Plaintiff has prevailed on the Motion, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is DENIED. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#20

(#20) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC MOTION FOR REMAND #10 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

#23

(#23) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter unsigned from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV16180, received on 8/10/2021. (et) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

#18

(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez.. (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#17

(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Rule 26 Report #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Other Filings - Pretrial and Trial Documents -Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Pursuant to the Court's 6/22/2021 Order, Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet is lacking. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#16

(#16) STATEMENT JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#15

(#15) REPLY Reply in Support of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez. (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#14) OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 8/2/2021 at 11:00 AM. (iv) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation.(Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation, (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter unsigned from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 21STCV16180, received on 8/10/2021. (et) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO REMAND CASE TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT #10 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The Motion is GRANTED. The action is REMANDED to Los Angeles County Superior Court. Although Plaintiff has prevailed on the Motion, Plaintiff's request for attorneys' fees and costs is DENIED. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (iv) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTES OF TELEPHONIC MOTION FOR REMAND #10 held before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Case called, and counsel make their appearance. The Court invites counsel to present their oral arguments. Arguments by counsel are heard. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court takes the matter under submission. An order will issue. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (iv) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Pursuant to General Order 21-08, the Motion to Remand #10 and Scheduling Conference set for August 2, 2021 will be held telephonically at 11:00 a.m. Counsel shall use the following conference call information: Number: (888) 363-4734; Access Code: 5200572. Counsel are ordered to remain available from 11:00 a.m. - 12:00 p.m. Any tentative ruling the Court may prepare, will be emailed to counsel prior to the hearing. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-10 days, filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez.. (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint Rule 26 Report #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - Other Filings - Pretrial and Trial Documents -Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. Pursuant to the Court's 6/22/2021 Order, Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet is lacking. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATEMENT JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT AND INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY Reply in Support of First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez. (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) OPPOSITION to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #10 filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez, upon Defendant Timothy Ramey served on 6/17/2021, answer due 7/8/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Timothy Ramey in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Panitz, Eric) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This case has been assigned to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. This matter is set for a scheduling conference on 8/2/2021 at 11:00 AM. (iv) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation.(Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation, (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (et) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez, upon Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation served on 5/13/2021, answer due 6/3/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lo Saecho agent for service of process for Schlumberger Technology Corporation in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 5/19/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT NO. 3 #1 ] (et) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Timothy Ramey, Schlumberger Technology Corporation., Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Carlos Chavez. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/29/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 . (et) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV16180 Receipt No: ACACDC-31460712 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Schlumberger Technology Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Heather D. Hearne, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint (Ex. 1 to Hearne Decl.), #3 Exhibit Service of Process Transmittals (Ex. 2 to Hearne Decl.), #4 Exhibit State Court Docket (Ex. 3 to Hearne Decl.), #5 Exhibit DFEH Complaint (Ex. 4 to Hearne Decl.), #6 Declaration Declaration of Jorge Andres Ortiz Donoso, #7 Declaration Declaration of Betty Marroquin, #8 Exhibit EMF (Marroquin Decl. Ex. 1)) (Attorney Heather D Hearne added to party Schlumberger Technology Corporation(pty:dft))(Hearne, Heather) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heather Dawn Hearne