This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:10:22 (UTC).

Carlo v. Trans Union LLC

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Carlo filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Trans Union LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District. The Judges overseeing this case are James C. Mahan and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Mahan

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark J Carlo

Defendant

Trans Union LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mitchell D Gliner

3017 W Charleston Blvd Ste 95

Las Vegas, NV 89102-1928

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Rebecca Bergh

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

2001 Bryan Street, Suite 1800

Dallas, TX 75201

Kurt R. Bonds

Attorney at ALVERSON TAYLOR & SANDERS

6605 Grand Montecito Parkway, Suite 200

Las Vegas, NV 89149

Rachael Swernofsky

Attorney at Quilling, Selander, Lownds, Winslett & Moser, P.C.

6900 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 800

Plano, TX 75024

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against TRANS UNION L.L.C (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6768931) by Mark J Carlo. Proof of service due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gliner, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mark J Carlo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gliner, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trans Union LLC re #1 Complaint,. (HAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark J Carlo. Trans Union LLC served on 1/27/2022. (Gliner, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2022.(Bergh, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#8

(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#9

(#9) First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mark J Carlo. (Gliner, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

#10

(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/18/2022. Motions due by 9/19/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachael Swernofsky on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Swernofsky, Rachael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#13

(#13) Joint STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Attorney Jennifer Bergh by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Swernofsky, Rachael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Attorney Jennifer Bergh by Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Swernofsky, Rachael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Rachael Swernofsky on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Swernofsky, Rachael) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (KF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 8/18/2022. Motions due by 9/19/2022. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/18/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/17/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mark J Carlo. (Gliner, Mitchell) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC.(Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Trans Union LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union LLC added. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Defenses filed by Trans Union LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/3/2022.(Bergh, Jennifer) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jennifer Rebecca Bergh on behalf of Defendant Trans Union LLC. (Bergh, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark J Carlo. Trans Union LLC served on 1/27/2022. (Gliner, Mitchell) (Entered: 02/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trans Union LLC re #1 Complaint,. (HAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Mark J Carlo. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gliner, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against TRANS UNION L.L.C (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0978-6768931) by Mark J Carlo. Proof of service due by 4/21/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gliner, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Rebecca Bergh

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt R. Bonds