This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 18:05:51 (UTC).

Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc v. International Science & Technology LP

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against International Science Technology LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vanessa D Gilmore. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03511

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vanessa D Gilmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc

Defendants

International Science & Technology LP

Diamatrix Limited, Inc.

International Science & Technology LP doing business as Diamatrix Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Danielle Joy Healey

Attorney at Fish Richardson PC

1221 Mckinney St, Ste 2800

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STIPULATED ORDER ON INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT granting #8 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION re: STIPULATED ORDER ON INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGEMENT by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc, filed.(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

7 #1

Complaint

#7

(#7) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Diamatrix Limited, Inc., International Science & Technology LP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

5 #6

Proposed Order

5 #5

Exhibit 4

5 #4

Exhibit 3

5 #3

Exhibit 2

5 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Declaration of Walsh

#5

(#5) MOTION for Discovery by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Walsh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases re: #1 Complaint, by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc, filed. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc identifying Carl Zeiss Meditec Inc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against International Science & Technology LP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23192671) filed by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATED ORDER ON INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGMENT granting #8 Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION re: STIPULATED ORDER ON INJUNCTION AND FINAL JUDGEMENT by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc, filed.(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JenniferOlson, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Diamatrix Limited, Inc., International Science & Technology LP. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(SarahShelby, 4) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Discovery by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Walsh, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Cases re: #1 Complaint, by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc, filed. (Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc identifying Carl Zeiss Meditec Inc as Corporate Parent, filed.(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against International Science & Technology LP (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23192671) filed by Carl Zeiss Meditec Cataract Technology Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Healey, Danielle) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Danielle Joy Healey