Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:30:04 (UTC).

Caris Life Sciences v. Fiordalisi

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Caris Life Sciences filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Fiordalisi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam A. Lindsay. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02886

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam A. Lindsay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caris Life Sciences Inc

Defendant

Michael Fiordalisi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robin G Shaughnessy

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Kimberly Ferguson Williams

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Ave, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

Jennifer Marie McCoy

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201

Defendant Attorneys

Kelli Michelle Hinson

Attorney at Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal

901 Main St, Suite 5500

Dallas, TX 75202

Monica Gaudioso

Attorney at Carrington Coleman Sloman & Blumenthal

901 Main St, Suite 5500

Dallas, TX 75202

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice re #8 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, by Caris Life Sciences Inc. (Williams, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER: The court has been notified by the parties that this case has settled. The parties are therefore directed to file a stipulation or notice of dismissal, or agreed motion to dismiss by 11/23/2020. The court determines that this case should be and is administratively closed. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/23/2020) (svc) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of SETTLEMENT filed by Caris Life Sciences Inc. (Williams, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

5 #1

Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension o

#5

(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michael Fiordalisi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [to 10.23.20]) (Hinson, Kelli) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#3

(#3) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Michael Fiordalisi (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Michael Fiordalisi. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11185073) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL With Prejudice re #8 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure, by Caris Life Sciences Inc. (Williams, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: The court has been notified by the parties that this case has settled. The parties are therefore directed to file a stipulation or notice of dismissal, or agreed motion to dismiss by 11/23/2020. The court determines that this case should be and is administratively closed. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/23/2020) (svc) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of SETTLEMENT filed by Caris Life Sciences Inc. (Williams, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 10/23/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/7/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Michael Fiordalisi (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint [to 10.23.20]) (Hinson, Kelli) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant Michael Fiordalisi to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 10/9/2020. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 9/22/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Michael Fiordalisi (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Michael Fiordalisi. (see document #1 for Image) (oyh) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Michael Fiordalisi. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-11185073) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Gaudioso, Monica) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caris Life Sciences Ltd is a litigant