This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/22/2021 at 21:00:50 (UTC).

Caris Life Sciences Ltd v. Natera Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2020 Caris Life Sciences Ltd filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Natera Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C Godbey. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01046

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C Godbey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Caris Life Sciences Ltd

Defendants

Derrick Ledford

Justin Troy Alter

Eric "Rick" Sause

David "Dave" Basher

Tara Hasher

Natera Inc

Kevin Shipp

Jonathan Derr

Elisabeth "Liz" Cramer

David Basher

Eric Sause

Elisabeth Cramer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Scott McDonald

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

2001 Ross Ave, Suite 1500 Lb 116

Dallas, TX 75201-2931

Brittaney Nicole Davis

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

John F McCarthy, Jr

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500 Lb 116

Dallas, TX 75201-2931

Ross G Reyes

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116

Dallas, TX 75201

Ross Garrick Reyes

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 1500, Lock Box 116

Dallas, TX 75201

Timothy A Rybacki

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

333 Commerce Street, Suite 1450

Nashville, TX 37201

Defendant Attorneys

Alise Abel

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

500 N. Akard, Suite 2500

Dallas, TX 75201

Michael J DePonte

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

Suite 2500, 500 N. Akard

Dallas, TX 75201

James Travis Underwood

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

John CC Sanders, Jr

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

2121 North Pearl St., 9Th Floor

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#82

81 #1

Proposed Order

#81

80 #1

Proposed Order

#80

#79

77 #1

Proposed Order

28 #1

Proposed Order

#28

#6

5 #1

Exhibit(s) A - H

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibit(s) A - H

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

125 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) ORDER granting #81 Motion to Destroy or Indefinitely Seal Documents Presently Under Seal. The District Clerk is hereby instructed to seal the documents no later than 4/6/2021. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 3/11/2021) (ykp) (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) MOTION Destroy or Indefinitely Seal Documents Presently Under Seal filed by Caris Life Sciences Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated per #80 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal. (mjr) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Caris Life Sciences Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER: The parties have announced that this case has been resolved. Any trial setting and scheduling order are vacated. The parties have thirty days to file dismissal papers. If the parties do not file dismissal papers within thirty days, the Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further notice. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 1/8/2021) (ctf) (Entered: 01/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ORDER granting #77 Unopposed Motion to Extend Jurisdictional Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/18/2021. Supplemental Responses due by 2/1/2021; Replies due by 2/8/2021 re: #28 Motion to Dismiss. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 12/17/2020) (axm) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Extend jurisdictional discovery deadlines filed by Caris Life Sciences Ltd (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) (Document Restricted) Sealed ORDER denying #64 Motion for a preliminary injunction. Because Caris has not demonstrated that it will sufferirreparable injury or that the balance of harms tips in its favor, the Court denies the motion. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 11/13/2020) (ndt) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ORDER re: #43 Motion to Expedite. The Court grants the motion with regard to specific jurisdiction and denies the motion with regard to general jurisdiction. Accordingly, the Court orders that Caris shall have ninety (90) days from the date of this Order to conduct jurisdictional discovery and its deadline to supplement its response to Defendants' motion to dismiss is fourteen (14) days from the close of discovery. Defendants shall have seven (7) days thereafter to reply to Caris' supplemental response. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 9/29/2020) (oyh) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) REPLY filed by Natera Inc re: #28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Sanders, John) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order or, Alternatively, MOTION for Injunction filed by Caris Life Sciences Ltd with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Original Verified Complaint served on Hillary Ledford for Derrick Ledford on 04.28.2020. (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Kevin Shipp ; served on 4/29/2020. (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Justin Troy Alter ; served on 5/2/2020. (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Natera Inc ; served on 4/28/2020. (McDonald, Michael) Modified summons return executed date on 5/6/2020 (pnp). (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Caris Life Sciences Ltd. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - H) (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Justin Troy Alter, David Basher, Elisabeth Cramer, Jonathan Derr, Tara Hasher, Derrick Ledford, Natera Inc, Eric Sause, Kevin Shipp. (oyh) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caris Life Sciences Ltd. (McDonald, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Caris Life Sciences Ltd. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10797365) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A - H) (McDonald, Michael) Modified Docket Text on 4/28/2020 (oyh). (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caris Life Sciences Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where Natera, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Scott McDonald

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John F McCarthy, Jr