This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/23/2022 at 08:28:00 (UTC).

Cargill, Incorporated v.National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Cargill, Incorporated filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Wilhelmina M. Wright and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-02563

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Wilhelmina M. Wright

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cargill, Incorporated

Defendant

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bryan R Freeman

Attorney at Maslon LLP

3300 Wells Fargo Center90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Rikke A Dierssen-Morice

Attorney at Maslon LLP

90 S. 7Th Streetsuite 3300

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jacob Bylund

Attorney at Faegre Baker Daniels

801 Grand Avenue33Rd Floor

Des Moines, IA 50309

Defendant Attorney

Joel T Wiegert

Attorney at Hinshaw & Culbertson LLP

333 South 7Th Streetste 2000

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9165126) filed by Cargill, Incorporated. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Cargill, Incorporated. (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (MMP) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. Jointly Signed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#8

(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/27/2021. (TJB) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargill, Incorporated. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. served on 12/3/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob D. Bylund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9251997 filed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

14 #14

Main Document

14 #1

Consent Form

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 2/22/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/22/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (Text-Only) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jacob Bylund for Cargill, Incorporated. Approved by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/12/2022. (ABR) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to Complaint filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 01/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jacob D. Bylund. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-9251997 filed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cargill, Incorporated. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. served on 12/3/2021, answer due 1/7/2022. (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 12/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. answer due 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 12/27/2021. (TJB) (Entered: 12/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Plead to Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.. Jointly Signed by Cargill, Incorporated. (Wiegert, Joel) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#5) (Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's #website. All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. (MMP) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#3) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-2563 (WMW/DTS). (MMP) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Cargill, Incorporated. (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh Pa. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9165126) filed by Cargill, Incorporated. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Dierssen-Morice, Rikke) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cargill, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where National Union Fire Insurance Company Of Pittsburgh, PA is a litigant