This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 06:56:08 (UTC).

Carey Chrisman v. Promote Mexico LLC

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Carey Chrisman filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Promote Mexico LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Chooljian and Dale S. Fischer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-10834

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Chooljian

Presiding Judge

Dale S. Fischer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carey Chrisman

Defendant

Promote Mexico LLC a Nevada limited liability company doing business as Score International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David A Shaneyfelt

Attorney at The Alvarez Firm ALC

24005 Ventura Boulevard

Calabasas, CA 91302

Lamdien T Le

Attorney at The Alvarez Firm ALC

24005 Ventura Boulevard

Calabasas, CA 91302

Defendant Attorneys

Sean Michael Sullivan

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves and Savitch LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

John D Alessio

Attorney at Procopio Cory Hargreaves and Savitch LLP

525 B Street Suite 2200

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#16

14 #2

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re Plaintiff's Motion To Allow For Filing O

14 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Carey Chrisman In Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum

#14

13 #1

Objections to Evidence

#13

12 #2

Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of His Memorandum In Op

12 #1

Declaration Of Carey Chrisman

#12

11 #1

Certificate of Service

#11

#10

9 #1

Memorandum

#9

#8

#7

#6

1 #3

Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION to Plaintiff's Motion to Allow for Filing of Declaration Nunc ProTunc filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING MOTION OFF CALENDAR AND UNDER SUBMISSION Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Court, on its own motion, takes Motions #9 and #11 set for Monday, February 3, 2020 off calendar and under submission. The Court will set a new hearing date if it decides oral argument would be helpful. A written order will follow. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pbl) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) PLAINTFF'S MOTION TO ALLOW FOR FILING OF DECLARATION NUNC PRO TUNC UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 6(B)(1) re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Forum Non Conveniens, Improper Venue, Fail to Join Necessary Party, Alternatively Transfer #9 filed by Plaintiff Carey Chrisman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Carey Chrisman In Support of Plaintiff's Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re Plaintiff's Motion To Allow For Filing Of Declaration Nunc Pro Tunc Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(B)(1))(Shaneyfelt, David) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY in Support NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Forum Non Conveniens, Improper Venue, Fail to Join Necessary Party, Alternatively Transfer #9 filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Evidence)(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Forum Non Conveniens, Improper Venue, Fail to Join Necessary Party, Alternatively Transfer #9 filed by Plaintiff Carey Chrisman. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Carey Chrisman, #2 Plaintiff's Request For Judicial Notice In Support Of His Memorandum In Opposition To Defendant's Motion To Dismiss)(Shaneyfelt, David) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Amendment to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Forum Non Conveniens, Improper Venue, Fail to Join Necessary Party, Alternatively Transfer #9 filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #8 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Forum Non Conveniens, Improper Venue, Fail to Join Necessary Party, Alternatively Transfer #9 served on 12/31/19. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Forum Non Conveniens, Improper Venue, Fail to Join Necessary Party, Alternatively Transfer filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/27/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum) (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC, identifying The Roger William Norman Trust u/t/a February 25, 1989, Trustees Roger Norman, Elise Norman. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (smo) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties served on 12/23/19. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Carey Chrisman, upon Defendant Promote Mexico LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Sally Armstrong, Apparently in Charge Caucasian Female 40 Yrs 6'4" 140 lbs Brown Hair in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 12/06/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Promote Mexico LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Carey Chrisman. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 11/13/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL) (ghap) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC. (Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Van Nuys Courthouse East, case number 19VECV01614 Receipt No: 0973-25006359 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Promote Mexico LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Notice of Case Assignment, #4 Exhibit Civil Case Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit ADR Information Packet, #6 Exhibit Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulations, #7 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons) (Attorney Sean Michael Sullivan added to party Promote Mexico LLC(pty:dft))(Sullivan, Sean) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lamdien T Le

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A Shaneyfelt