This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2019 at 09:46:59 (UTC).

Cardoza et al v. Western Express Inc et al

Case Summary

On 05/17/2019 Cardoza filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Western Express Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wyoming District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly H Rankin and Alan B Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00102

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wyoming District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly H Rankin

Presiding Judge

Alan B Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Nancy Carol Cardoza

John Cardoza

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Western Express Inc

Adrian Anthony

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Philip A Nicholas

Attorney at NICHOLAS & TANGEMAN

170 North 5Th Street, P O Box 928

Laramie, WY 82073-0928

Meggan Jo Nicholas

Attorney at NICHOLAS & TANGEMAN, LLC

170 North 5Th Street, P.O. Box 928

Laramie, WY 82073

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Andrew F Sears

Attorney at HALL & EVANS LLC

152 North Durbin Street, Suite 404

Casper, WY 82601

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #29

(#12) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION to Vacate Discovery Deadlines and Request for Consolidated Pretrial Conference filed by Consolidated Counter Claimant Adrian Anthony. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ, 2:19-cv-00102-ABJ(Sears, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 7/5/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery. Case number 18-CV-125-J shall serve as the master file for the now consolidated cases.(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

8 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery filed by Defendants Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sears, Andrew) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#7

(#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Western Express Inc,. (Sears, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendants Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc. (Sears, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant John Cardoza by Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc. (Sears, Andrew) Modified counter-defendant and text on 6/13/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

4 #1

Cover Letter

#4

(#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc, filed by Nancy Carol Cardoza, John Cardoza. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

1 #4

Consent Form

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 09:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson. (Court Staff, sjlg) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting (29) Motion to Vacate in case 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ Initial Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 9:30 AM in Judge Johnson Chambers (Room No. 2018) before Honorable Alan B Johnson.Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ, 2:19-cv-00102-ABJ(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • Motions No Longer Referred: (29 in 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ) Stipulated MOTION to Vacate Discovery Deadlines Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ, 2:19-cv-00102-ABJ (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION to Vacate Discovery Deadlines and Request for Consolidated Pretrial Conference filed by Consolidated Counter Claimant Adrian Anthony. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ, 2:19-cv-00102-ABJ(Sears, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 Proposed Order) (Court Staff, ssw). Modified on 7/5/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ANSWER to (24 in 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ) Amended Counterclaim, by John Cardoza. Associated Cases: 2:18-cv-00125-ABJ, 2:19-cv-00102-ABJ (Nicholas, Meggan) Text Modified on 7/2/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DISREGARD: Filing Error - To be refiled in Lead case 18-CV-125-J ANSWER to #5 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by John Cardoza. (Nicholas, Meggan) Modified on 7/2/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER by the Honorable Alan B Johnson granting #8 Motion to Consolidate Cases for Discovery. Case number 18-CV-125-J shall serve as the master file for the now consolidated cases.(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred: #8 Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION REFERRED TO Judge Kelly H Rankin. Stipulated MOTION to Consolidate Cases for Discovery filed by Defendants Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sears, Andrew) Modified on 6/11/2019 (Court Staff, ssw). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE filed by Western Express Inc,. (Sears, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury filed by Defendants Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc. (Sears, Andrew) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Counter-Defendant John Cardoza by Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc. (Sears, Andrew) Modified counter-defendant and text on 6/13/2019 (Court Staff, sjlg). (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Adrian Anthony, Western Express Inc, filed by Nancy Carol Cardoza, John Cardoza. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter) (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by the Honorable Scott W Skavdahl. Case reassigned to Honorable Alan B Johnson and Honorable Kelly H Rankin for all further proceedings; Honorable Kelly H Rankin no longer assigned to case as presiding Judge.(Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) E-FILING ERROR. DOCUMENT (AMENDED COMPLAINT) CANNOT BE E-FILED. PLEASE FILE AN ORIGINAL AMENDED COPY WITH USDC CLERK OF COURT. NON-PUBLIC DOCUMENT pursuant to the Judicial Conference Policy on Privacy and Public Access - MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, First Amended filed by Plaintiffs John Cardoza, Nancy Carol Cardoza. (Nicholas, Philip) Modified document security and docket text on 5/20/2019. Document deleted, docket text edited on 5/20/2019 (see note above for details) (Court Staff, szf). (Entered: 05/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (2 summonses issued)(Filing fee $400 receipt #CHY030928.) filed by Nancy Carol Cardoza, John Cardoza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope, #4 Consent Form) (Court Staff, ssw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.