This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/07/2020 at 09:17:23 (UTC).

CARDILE v. HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 CARDILE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Noel L. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01333

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Noel L. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SALVATORE CARDILE

Defendant

HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN M. BLAKE

Attorney at BENNETT, BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLC

960 Harvest Lane, Building B, Suite 100, 67-654-1104

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Defendant Attorney

MICHAEL J. WIETRZYCHOWSKI

Attorney at SCHNADER, HARRISON, SEGAL & LEWIS, LLP

220 Lake Drive East, Suite 200

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002-1165

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2020
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: The initial scheduling conference on 4/7/2020 at 11:30 A.M. shall be conducted VIA TELEPHONE. Counsel for Plaintiff shall initiate the telephone call and shall provide the Court with a dial-in number. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/24/2020. (slc) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Order Initial Conference set for 4/7/2020 11:30 AM in Room 2010 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/13/2020. (rss, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. identifying Holman Enterprises, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC..(WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND. Answer due by 3/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 3/10/2020. (rss, ) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION To Exend Time to Answer Complaint by HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.. (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #4 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. has been DENIED. The answer due date has expired. (rss, ) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Holman Automotive Group, Inc.. Attorney MICHAEL J. WIETRZYCHOWSKI for HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. added. (WIETRZYCHOWSKI, MICHAEL) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by SALVATORE CARDILE. HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (BLAKE, KEVIN) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HOLMAN AUTOMOTIVE GROUP, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number NEW041936) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SALVATORE CARDILE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cry, ) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KEVIN M. BLAKE