This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2022 at 08:07:05 (UTC).

Cardenas v. St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 01/12/2022 Cardenas filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against St Jude Health Wellness Center Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Lisette M. Reid. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20165

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Lisette M. Reid

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sandra Cardenas

Defendants

St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp.

Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nathaly Saavedra

Attorney at PereGonza The Attorneys, PLLC

1414 Nw 107Th Ave, Suite 302

Doral, FL 33172

 

Court Documents

13 #4

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Final Judgment

13 #3

Text of Proposed Order

13 #2

Exhibit Demand Letter

13 #1

Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit

13 #13

Main Document

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order

11 #11

Main Document

#10

(#10) ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

#9

(#9) Clerks Entry of Default as to St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp., Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/11/2022. (cds) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

8 #1

Exhibit Clerk's Default

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/15/2022 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS re #1 Complaint, filed by Sandra Cardenas. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment against all Defendants by Sandra Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Demand Letter, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Default Final Judgment)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 the Plaintiff's Motion for an Enlargement of Time to file the Motion for Default Judgment. The Plaintiff shall file her motion for default judgment by March 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/22/2022. (kmz) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Sandra Cardenas re #10 Administrative Order of Joint Liability and MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 02/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER ON DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT PROCEDURE. Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 02/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Clerks Entry of Default as to St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp., Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/11/2022. (cds) (Entered: 02/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez, St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp. by Sandra Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Clerk's Default)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 2/15/2022 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS re #1 Complaint, filed by Sandra Cardenas. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (drz) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandra Cardenas. Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez served on 1/13/2022, response/answer due 2/3/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sandra Cardenas. St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp. served on 1/13/2022, response/answer due 2/3/2022. (Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez, St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp. (drz) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Marilyn C. Rodriguez Dominguez, St. Jude Health Wellness Center Corp.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15313182, filed by Sandra Cardenas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Exhibit)(Saavedra, Nathaly) (Entered: 01/12/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathaly Saavedra