Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/22/2020 at 08:37:17 (UTC).

Cardenas et al v. Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2020 Cardenas filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Fouratt, Kirtan Khalsa and Robert C. Brack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00374

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Mexico District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Fouratt

Presiding Judges

Kirtan Khalsa

Robert C. Brack

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

A. Chavez Campos

Adriana Cardenas

Defendant

Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Quinn Scott Simons

Attorney at The Simons Firm, LLP

P.O. Box 5333

Santa Fe, NM 87502-5333

Frieda Simons Burnes

Attorney at The Simons Firm, LLP

Post Office Box 5333

Santa Fe, NM 87502

Defendant Attorneys

Bayard Roberts

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk

500 Fourth Street Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Megan Muirhead

Attorney at Modrall Sperling Roehl Harris & Sisk, P.A.

P. O. Box 2168

Albuquerque, NM 87103

 

Court Documents

11 #4

Exhibit F

11 #3

Exhibit E

11 #2

Exhibit D

11 #1

Exhibit C

#11

(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F) (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Remand Agreed Extension for Defendant to File Response (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#6

(#6) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand by Adriana Cardenas. (Simons, Quinn) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#3

(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 6/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/18/2020. (gbg) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

Exhibit A: STATE COURT FILE

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from First Judicial District Court, Santa Fe County, case number D-101-CV-2020-00157. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: STATE COURT FILE, #3 Exhibit B: RFA ANSWER)(Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F) (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 06/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Remand Agreed Extension for Defendant to File Response (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. Initial Disclosures (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER FINDING GOOD CAUSE TO DELAY ENTERING A SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. In light of the pending #5 Motion to Remand and the parties' representations to the Court, the Court hereby finds good cause under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 to delay holding a scheduling conference and entering a scheduling order. If the presiding judge denies the motion, the Court will set the matter for scheduling. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER VACATING INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. The Court's #3 Initial Scheduling Order, including the Telephonic Rule 16 Hearing set for 6/2/2020, is hereby VACATED. (gbg)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint Status Report and Provisional Discovery Plan by Walmart Supercenter Store, Inc. (Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand by Adriana Cardenas. (Simons, Quinn) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • Docket(#4) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to Sr. District Judge Robert C. Brack as the trial judge. Under D.N.M.LR-Civ. 10.1, the first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judges.Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judges' initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa no longer assigned to this case.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (dr) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Telephonic Rule 16(c) Hearing set for 6/2/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt. Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2020. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 5/18/2020. (gbg) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (arp) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa and United States Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Fouratt assigned. (arp) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number ANMDC-7091311 re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from First Judicial District Court, Santa Fe County, case number D-101-CV-2020-00157. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: STATE COURT FILE, #3 Exhibit B: RFA ANSWER)(Roberts, Bayard) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bayard Roberts

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Megan Muirhead