This case was last updated from PACER on 01/31/2020 at 08:26:37 (UTC).

CARDEN v. EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 CARDEN filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is CLAY D LAND. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00202

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CLAY D LAND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENITA CARDEN

Defendants

NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC

EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC

NELNET SERVICING LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OCTAVIO GOMEZ

201 N Franklin St 7Th Fl

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

LEWIS P PERLING

1180 Peachtree St

Atlanta, GA 30101

Daniel J. Huff

Attorney at Huff Powell & Bailey, LLC

999 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 950, Atlanta

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against NELNET SERVICING LLC by KENITA CARDEN (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit name of defendant. (ggs). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit First Amended Complaint

#13

(#13) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by KENITA CARDEN filed by OCTAVIO GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(a)(3) for failure to identify the proper legal entity by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC filed by Daniel J. Huff.(Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#11

(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC (Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC.(Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#9

(#9) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/10/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/30/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

8 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Extension to Answer Complaint

#8

(#8) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC filed by Daniel J. Huff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Extension to Answer Complaint)(Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (PERLING, LEWIS) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(PERLING, LEWIS)Attorney LEWIS P PERLING added to party EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC(pty:dft) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENITA CARDEN as to NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC. (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENITA CARDEN as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons issued as to NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. (tlf). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3328773, $400 filed by KENITA CARDEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketREMARK: Defendant NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC's name updated to reflect the correct name: NELNET SERVICING LLC. (ggs) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED #1 Complaint, against NELNET SERVICING LLC by KENITA CARDEN (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) Modified on 1/22/2020 to edit name of defendant. (ggs). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall be permitted to amend her Complaint to name the correct Defendant. Plaintiff shall file her amended complaint on CM/ECF by January 29, 2020. The motion to dismiss for failure to name the proper legal entity #12 is moot. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D LAND on 01/22/2020 (CCL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) UNOPPOSED MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by KENITA CARDEN filed by OCTAVIO GOMEZ. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint)(GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(a)(3) for failure to identify the proper legal entity by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC filed by Daniel J. Huff.(Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC (Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Complaint by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC.(Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULES 16/26 ORDER: Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 2/10/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 12/30/2019 (tlf). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREMARK: Insofar as Local Rule 6.1 provides that counsel may stipulate for "...extensions of time within which to answer the complaint...by written, filed stipulations of counsel, not to exceed more than thirty (30) from the original answer deadline..." and insofar as the requested extension does not exceed 30 days, #8 motion is being construed as such a stipulation, and the motion is being administratively terminated without ruling by the Court (tlf). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC filed by Daniel J. Huff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Re Extension to Answer Complaint)(Huff, Daniel) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC identifying Corporate Parent EQUIFAX INC for EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (PERLING, LEWIS) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC.(PERLING, LEWIS)Attorney LEWIS P PERLING added to party EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC(pty:dft) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENITA CARDEN as to NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS INC. (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by KENITA CARDEN as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC. (GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons issued as to NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. (tlf). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC (tlf). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency, Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by KENITA CARDEN; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. No need to re-file (tlf). (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC, NELNET BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3328773, $400 filed by KENITA CARDEN (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(GOMEZ, OCTAVIO) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less