This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2022 at 09:18:42 (UTC).

Cardamone et al v. Liberty Mutual Insurance

Case Summary

On 12/16/2021 Cardamone filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Liberty Mutual Insurance. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock, Christine M. Arguello and N. Reid Neureiter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03378

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

N. Reid Neureiter

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Christine M. Arguello

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Geoffrey Cardamone

Katie Cardamone

Defendant

Liberty Mutual Insurance

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Anna Regina Bloomer

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

David J. Furtado

Attorney at Furtado Law PC

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 755

Denver, CO 80209

Defendant Attorneys

Brian John Spano

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

David M. Rosenfield

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

Holly C. White

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP

1601 19Th Street,, Suite 1000

Denver, CO 80202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance All parties do not consent.. (Rosenfield, David) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Rosenfield on behalf of Liberty Mutual InsuranceAttorney David M. Rosenfield added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft) (Rosenfield, David) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Liberty Mutual InsuranceAttorney Holly C. White added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Regina Bloomer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Anna Regina Bloomer added to party Geoffrey Cardamone(pty:pla), Attorney Anna Regina Bloomer added to party Katie Cardamone(pty:pla) (Bloomer, Anna) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David J. Furtado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David J. Furtado added to party Geoffrey Cardamone(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Furtado added to party Katie Cardamone(pty:pla) (Furtado, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 17 December 2021. Consent Form due by 2/23/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/2/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

#6

(#15) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

2 #1

Exhibit A

2 #2

Main Document

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#20) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Nuereiter is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/27/2022. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #18 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-3378-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance All parties do not consent.. (Rosenfield, David) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David M. Rosenfield on behalf of Liberty Mutual InsuranceAttorney David M. Rosenfield added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft) (Rosenfield, David) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of Liberty Mutual InsuranceAttorney Holly C. White added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance(pty:dft) (White, Holly) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance.(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Regina Bloomer on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Anna Regina Bloomer added to party Geoffrey Cardamone(pty:pla), Attorney Anna Regina Bloomer added to party Katie Cardamone(pty:pla) (Bloomer, Anna) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David J. Furtado on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney David J. Furtado added to party Geoffrey Cardamone(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Furtado added to party Katie Cardamone(pty:pla) (Furtado, David) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE of Service by mail by Clerk of Court re #11 to David J. Furtado, c/o Furtado Law PC 3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Ste. 755 Denver, CO 80209. Text Only Entry (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 17 December 2021. Consent Form due by 2/23/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/2/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 3/9/2022 02:00 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/17/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03378-NRN. (trvo, ) (Entered: 12/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, upon Liberty Mutual Insurance on 11/30/2021, filed by Plaintiffs Geoffrey Cardamone, Katie Cardamone. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint against Liberty Mutual Insurance, filed by Geoffrey Cardamone, Katie Cardamone.(jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Liberty Mutual Insurance, filed by Geoffrey Cardamone, Katie Cardamone.(jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jcharl, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Filing of State Court Records by Defendant Liberty Mutual Insurance (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Insurance from Denver District Court, Case Number 21cv33507. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8228709), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Federal Civil Cover Sheet)(Spano, Brian) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Holly C. White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian John Spano