This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/07/2021 at 08:33:56 (UTC).

Carbamericas, Inc. v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Carbamericas, Inc filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. Kevin Castel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00101

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. Kevin Castel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carbamericas, Inc.

Defendant

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Matthew Heilig

Attorney at Hill Rivkins LLP

45 Broadway, Suite 1500

Ny, NY 10006

Defendant Attorney

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference will be adjourned to March 26, 2021 at 12:00 P.M. The dial-in will remain the same: 888-363-4749 with code 3667981. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/26/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/1/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#9

(#9) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark A. Beckman dated February 25, 2021. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/7/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23376395)Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference will be adjourned to March 26, 2021 at 12:00 P.M. The dial-in will remain the same: 888-363-4749 with code 3667981. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 3/26/2021 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/1/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Mark A. Beckman dated February 25, 2021. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. waiver sent on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, conferences with the Court in civil cases will be held by teleconferencing until further notice. For initial pretrial conferences, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall, no later than 5 business days before the conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The call-in information for all teleconferences is: Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 Access Code: 3667981 (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/7/2021) (jwh) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23376395)Document filed by Carbamericas, Inc...(Heilig, Justin) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Carbamericas, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark A. Beckman