This case was last updated from PACER on 04/05/2021 at 07:33:00 (UTC).

Caraveo et al v. General Motors LLC

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Caraveo filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against General Motors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Polk Failla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01009

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Katherine Polk Failla

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brian Boner

Tato Caraveo

Defendant

General Motors LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James H. Freeman

Attorney at Liebowitz Law Firm, PLLC

11 Sunrise Plaza #305

Valley Stream, NY 11580

Defendant Attorneys

Kristen A. McCallion

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

7 Times Square, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

Vivian Chiwing Cheng

Attorney at Fish & Richardson P.C.

7 Times Square, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#22

(#22) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Set Aside Default re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . filed by General Motors LLC. Before the Court is Defendant General Motors LLC's Motion to Set Aside Default (the Motion). Having considered the Motion and all related arguments and filings in support thereof, the Court FINDS that the Motion should be and therefore is GRANTED. Accordingly, for good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that the entry of default is set aside and the Clerk's Certificate of Default as to General Motors LLC is VACATED. Defendant General Motors LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. 1) on or by April 7, 2021.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/29/2021) (nb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#21

(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . . Document filed by Brian Boner, Tato Caraveo..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#20

(#20) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC. Document filed by General Motors LLC..(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#19

(#19) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by General Motors LLC. Related Document Number: [D16]..(McCallion, Kristen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . . Document filed by General Motors LLC..(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Set Aside Default . Document filed by General Motors LLC..(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivian Chiwing Cheng on behalf of General Motors LLC..(Cheng, Vivian) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Boner, Tato Caraveo..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-23821364, paid on 2/4/2021..(dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: General Motors LLC answer due 4/7/2021. (nb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Set Aside Default re #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . filed by General Motors LLC. Before the Court is Defendant General Motors LLC's Motion to Set Aside Default (the Motion). Having considered the Motion and all related arguments and filings in support thereof, the Court FINDS that the Motion should be and therefore is GRANTED. Accordingly, for good cause, it is hereby ORDERED that the entry of default is set aside and the Clerk's Certificate of Default as to General Motors LLC is VACATED. Defendant General Motors LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt. 1) on or by April 7, 2021.. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/29/2021) (nb) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #19 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) RESPONSE to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . . Document filed by Brian Boner, Tato Caraveo..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC. Document filed by General Motors LLC..(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by General Motors LLC. Related Document Number: [D16]..(McCallion, Kristen) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) DECLARATION of Timothy G. Gorbatoff in Support re: #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default .. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Set Aside Default . . Document filed by General Motors LLC..(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Set Aside Default . Document filed by General Motors LLC..(McCallion, Kristen) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivian Chiwing Cheng on behalf of General Motors LLC..(Cheng, Vivian) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors LLC..(dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 402.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-23821364, paid on 2/4/2021..(dnh) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Hon. Jesse M. Furman's Opinion and Order re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Boner, Tato Caraveo..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Brian Boner, Tato Caraveo..(Freeman, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against General Motors LLC. Document filed by Tato Caraveo, Brian Boner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H).(Freeman, James) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vivian Chiwing Cheng