This case was last updated from PACER on 02/10/2020 at 07:44:15 (UTC).

Carapella V. Glass

Case Summary

On 12/12/2019 Carapella filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Glass. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is William F. Jung. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03050

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William F. Jung

 

Party Details

Appellant

Dawn A. Carapella

Appellee and In Re

Andrew B. Glass

Holiday, FL 34691

Interested Party

Jet Recycling America, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorneys

Lori Virginia Vaughan

Attorney at Trenam, Kemker, Scharf, Barkin, Frye, O'Neill & Mullis,

Suite 2700, 101 E Kennedy Blvd

Tampa, FL 33602

Lynn Welter Sherman

Attorney at Trenam Law

200 Central Ave Ste 1600

St Petersburg, FL 33701-3960

Interested Party Attorney

Mark David Hildreth

Attorney at Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP - Sarasota

240 S Pineapple Ave - 10Th Flr, Po Box 49948

Sarasota, FL 34230-6948

 

Court Documents

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Dawn A. Carapella. (Attachments: #1 2 Pro Memo from 4-16-19 hearing Doc 169)(JN) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit

9 #1

2 Pro Memo from 4-16-19 hearing Doc 169

#1

(#1) BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Dawn A. Carapella. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:18-bk-2707-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LNR) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to extend time to File Appellant's Brief by Dawn A. Carapella. (Sherman, Lynn) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 12/12/2019. (LNR) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

5 #6

4 - Appeallants Designation 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000215_Appellant_Designation_

5 #7

5 - Glass Public Docket

5 #8

8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_7

5 #9

8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000032_Amended_Schedule_ABSchedule_C_and_Summary_of_Assets

5 #2

3 - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000198_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Summ

5 #3

3a - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000201_Order_Overruling_Objection_to

5 #4

3b - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000203_Final_Judgment_in_Favor_of_th

5 #5

3c - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000206_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summa

5 #46

8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000123_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Extend_T

5 #10

8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000039_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions__Contains_

5 #11

8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000047_Response_to_the_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemp

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Objections to Debtor's Claim of Exemptions held on 4/16/19 before Judge Catherine Peek McEwen.(JNB) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Dawn A. Carapella. (Attachments: #1 2 Pro Memo from 4-16-19 hearing Doc 169)(JN) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion to extend time to file appellant's brief up to and including 4/10/2020. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 1/15/2020. (CCB) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to extend time to File Appellant's Brief by Dawn A. Carapella. (Sherman, Lynn) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 12/12/2019. (LNR) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal consisting of items as designated on transmittal Related document: #1 Bankruptcy notice of appeal filed by Dawn A. Carapella. (Attachments: #1 2- Notice of Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000207_Part_1_Notice_of_Appeal_Filing_Fee_Not_Paid_or_Not_Required_Filed_by_Lynn_Welter_Sherman_Attor, #2 3 - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000198_Order_Granting_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_filed_by_the_Debtor_the_Court_will_enter_a_sep, #3 3a - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000201_Order_Overruling_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions, #4 3b - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000203_Final_Judgment_in_Favor_of_the_Debtor_upholding_under_11_USC_ _522, #5 3c - Order on Appeal 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000206_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_fioled_by_Trustee_Dawn_Carapella, #6 4 - Appeallants Designation 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000215_Appellant_Designation_of_Contents_for_Inclusion_in_Record_on_Appeal_Filed_by_Lynn_Welter_S, #7 5 - Glass Public Docket, #8 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000001_Voluntary_Petition_under_Chapter_7, #9 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000032_Amended_Schedule_ABSchedule_C_and_Summary_of_Assets_and_Liabilities_with_Certificate_of, #10 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000039_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions__Contains_negative_notice_Filed_by_Megan_Wilso, #11 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000047_Response_to_the_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_filed_by_the_Trustee_Filed_by_Jo, #12 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000048_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Chapter_7_Trustees_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_b, #13 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000056_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_JONATHAN_SEMACH_MARK_HILDRETH_LORI, #14 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000066_Joinder_in_Trustees_Objection_to_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_by_Mark_D_Hildreth_on_behalf, #15 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000067_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_JONATHAN_SEMACH_LORI_VAUGHAN_MARK_H, #16 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000069_Emergency_Motion_For_Contempt__in_addition_to_Motion_For_Sanctions_for_Violation_of_the_A, #17 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000070_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_Funds_in_IRA_Account_Filed_by_L, #18 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000071_Certificate_of_Necessity_Filed_by_Lori_V_Vaughan_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behalf_of_Truste, #19 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000074_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Contempt_and_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Pr, #20 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000078_Interim_Order_Granting_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_of_the_Estate_Hearing_scheduled_for, #21 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000079_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Respond_to_Chapter_7_Trustees_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exe, #22 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000082_Motion_in_Opposition_to_Chapter_7_Trustees_Emergency_Motion_for_Contempt_andor_Sanctions, #23 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000087_Order_Partially_Granting_Motion_For_Contempt_in_Part_For_Debtors_Willfull_Violation_of_th, #24 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000090_Order_Directing_Mediation_Re_Trustees_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions, #25 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000091_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_-_Extending_Time_to_File_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment, #26 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000098_Motion_in_Opposition_to_Chapter_7_Trustees_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Funds_in_IRA, #27 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000099_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_by_Lori_V_V, #28 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Exhibits_in_Support_of_Trustees_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Lor, #29 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_2_Exhibit, #30 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_3_Exhibit, #31 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_4_Exhibit, #32 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000100_Part_5_Exhibit, #33 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000101_Request_to_Take_Judicial_Notice_Filed_by_Lori_V_Vaughan_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behalf_of, #34 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000102_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exemptions_Filed_by_Mark_D, #35 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000103_Notice_Regarding_Opposing_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_E, #36 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000104_Notice_Regarding_Opposing_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_E, #37 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000105_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exempti, #38 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000106_Notice_of_Hearing_on_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim_of_Exempti, #39 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000107_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds_Filed_by_Debtor_Andrew_B_Glas, #40 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000108_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Unholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Fu, #41 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000109_Notice_Regarding_Opposing_Motions_for_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds, #42 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000114_Mediators_Report_and_Notice_of_Inability_to_Reach_an_Agreement_in_Mediation_Filed_by_Lori, #43 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000115_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds_Filed_by, #44 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000116_Response_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Filed_by_Mark_D_Hildreth_on_behalf_of_Cr, #45 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000122_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Reply_to_Responses_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Judgment_Unhold, #46 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000123_Notice_of_Preliminary_Hearing_on_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Reply_to_Responses_to_Debtors_M, #47 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000127_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_ANDREW_GLASS_LORI_VAUGHAN_MARK_HILD, #48 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000128_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Reply_to_Responses_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary, #49 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000137_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Trustees_objection_to_Debtors_claim_of_exemptions, #50 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000138_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Joinder_in_Trustees_Objection_to_Claim_of_Exemptions_file, #51 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000139_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically, #52 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000140_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim, #53 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000141_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_on_Objection_to_Debtors_Claim, #54 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000142_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_re_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_Upholding_Exemption_of_IRA_Fun, #55 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000145_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_Submit_Reply_to_Trustees_and_JRAs_Objections_and_Responses_to_D, #56 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000153_Order_Granting_Motion_to_Extend_Time_to_reply_to_Summary_Judgment_Responses, #57 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000155_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_21919_on_Matters_outlined_in_Docket_Entry_127_To_pur, #58 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000157_Response_to_Trustees_and_JRAs_Objections_and_Responses_to_Debtors_Motion_for_Summary_Ju, #59 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000166_Part_1_Notice_of_Filing_Deposition_Transcripts_in_Support_of_Trustees_Motion_for_Summary_Judgmen, #60 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000166_Part_2_Exhibit, #61 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000166_Part_3_Exhibit, #62 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000170_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_F, #63 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000174_Letter_Re_re_Andrew_Glass_from_New_York_Attorney_Anthony_Yovino, #64 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000175_Response_to_Her_Honor_Judge_McEwens_Admonition_to_Prove_the_Inapplicability_of_the_Musso, #65 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000176_Limited_Response_to_Correct_Record_Filed_by_Lori_V_Vaughan_Attorney_for_Trustee_on_behalf, #66 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000187_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_Andrew_Glass_Mark_Hildreth, #67 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000188_Supplement_to_Arguments_for_Exemption_of_IRA_Funds_and_Accounts_as_for_Presentation_at_the, #68 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000189_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Trustees_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_speci, #69 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000193_Transcript_Regarding_Hearing_Held_July_31_2019_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Proper, #70 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000195_Hearing_Proceeding_Memo_Hearing_Held_-_APPEARANCES_ANDREW_GLASS_LORI_VAUGHAN_MARK_HILD, #71 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000196_Notice_Rescheduling_Hearing_on_Emergency_Motion_for_Turnover_of_Property_-_specifically_F, #72 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000200_Order_Denying_Motion_For_Summary_Judgment_filed_by_Jet_Recycling_America_Inc, #73 8-18-bk-02707_Docket_000207_Part_2_Exhibit_A)(JN) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Andrew B. Glass. Related case(s): yes (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LNR) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dawn A. Carapella. Related case(s): No (Sherman, Lynn) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 12/16/2019. (SAO) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Dawn A. Carapella. Bankruptcy Court case number 8:18-bk-2707-CPM. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 12/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(LNR) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.