This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/09/2021 at 10:05:06 (UTC).

Cara v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Cara filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Kato Crews and R. Brooke Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00718

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

S. Kato Crews

R. Brooke Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Cara

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Collin Joseph Earl

Attorney at Earl & Earl PLLC-Colorado Springs

1259 Lake Plaza Drive, Suite 230

Colorado Springs, CO 80906

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Valentine Uduebor

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) ORDER SETTING TRIAL: Four-day Jury Trial is set to commence 8/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson with a Trial Preparation Conference on 7/15/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/5/21. (jdyne, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Kimberly Cara (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

20 #1

redlined version

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/14/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2022. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/23/21. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#19

(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order (Amended) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

#18

(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#17

(#17) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#14

(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

1 #11

USDC Cover Sheet

1 #10

State Court - Summons

1 #7

State Court - Return of Service

1 #6

State Court - Exhibit 5 to the Complaint

1 #5

State Court - Exhibit 4 to the Complaint

1 #4

State Court - Exhibit 3 to the Complaint

1 #3

State Court - Exhibit 2 to the Complaint

1 #2

State Court - Exhibit 1 to the Complaint

1 #1

State Court - Complaint

#1

(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal filed by attorney Evan Stephenson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER SETTING TRIAL: Four-day Jury Trial is set to commence 8/15/2022 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson with a Trial Preparation Conference on 7/15/2022 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A 902 before Judge R. Brooke Jackson. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 5/5/21. (jdyne, ) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Kimberly Cara (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#21) ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY AND COURT: Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3(a), Collin Joseph Earl was administratively removed from the court's attorney roll and barred from filing electronically under CM/ECF for failing to pay the 2020 Biennial Fee. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's existing Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Upon reinstatement, counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance in this case. (Text Only Entry) (mfred) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/14/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/14/2022. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/23/21. (Attachments: #1 redlined version) (jdyne, ) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Proposed Scheduling Order (Amended) by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER: In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 4/22/2021 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 4/15/2021 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 3/25/2021. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-00718-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, ) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Uduebor, Valentine) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Collin Joseph Earl on behalf of Kimberly CaraAttorney Collin Joseph Earl added to party Kimberly Cara(pty:pla) (Earl, Collin) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#8) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. By Patrick D. Butler, Boulder County District Court Judge on 2/23/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Exhibits, and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon State Farm on 2/9/2021. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Kimberly Cara.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal filed by attorney Evan Stephenson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Attorney Services Portal Account pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Boulder County, State of Colorado, Case Number 2021CV30102. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7756377), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court - Complaint, #2 State Court - Exhibit 1 to the Complaint, #3 State Court - Exhibit 2 to the Complaint, #4 State Court - Exhibit 3 to the Complaint, #5 State Court - Exhibit 4 to the Complaint, #6 State Court - Exhibit 5 to the Complaint, #7 State Court - Return of Service, #8 State Court - Order Granting Motion for Extension to Respond, #9 State Court - Civil Cover Sheet, #10 State Court - Summons, #11 USDC Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Collin J. Earl