This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2020 at 16:54:58 (UTC).

Capstone Commodities, LLC v. Villalpando et al

Case Summary

On 06/08/2020 Capstone Commodities, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Villalpando. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee Yeakel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00606

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee Yeakel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capstone Commodities, LLC

Defendants

Bonnie Villalpando

Abel Villalpando

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Paul Casey

Attorney at Casey Law Group

6836 Bee Caves Rd, Bldg 1, Suite 245

Austin, TX 78746

Defendant Attorneys

Richard E. Anderson

Attorney at Anderson Vela LLP

4920 Westport Drive

The Colony, TX 75056

John D. Wheeler

Attorney at John D. Wheeler & Associates

Po Box 1810

Alamogordo, NM 88310

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint., filed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casey, Brian) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

#9

(#9) Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by John D. Wheeler; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100038798. (dm) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for John D. Wheeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Wheeler for Abel Villalpando, Bonnie Villalpando. (dm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Richard E. Anderson added to party Abel Villalpando(pty:dft), Attorney Richard E. Anderson added to party Bonnie Villalpando(pty:dft) by Abel Villalpando, Bonnie Villalpando.(Anderson, Richard) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. Abel Villalpando served on 6/13/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/23/2020 to correct party name (dm). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. Bonnie Villalpando served on 6/13/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/23/2020 to correct party name (dm). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Abel Villalpando, Bonnie Villalpando. (dl) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Capstone Commodities, LLC. (Casey, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13642660), filed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Casey, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending #1 Complaint., filed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Casey, Brian) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid by John D. Wheeler; Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 100038798. (dm) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for John D. Wheeler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Lee Yeakel. (lt) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John D. Wheeler for Abel Villalpando, Bonnie Villalpando. (dm) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint . Attorney Richard E. Anderson added to party Abel Villalpando(pty:dft), Attorney Richard E. Anderson added to party Bonnie Villalpando(pty:dft) by Abel Villalpando, Bonnie Villalpando.(Anderson, Richard) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. Abel Villalpando served on 6/13/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/23/2020 to correct party name (dm). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. Bonnie Villalpando served on 6/13/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Casey, Brian) Modified on 6/23/2020 to correct party name (dm). (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Abel Villalpando, Bonnie Villalpando. (dl) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Hightower. (dl) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (dl) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Capstone Commodities, LLC. (Casey, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13642660), filed by Capstone Commodities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Casey, Brian) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John David Wheeler

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Ernest Anderson