This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/05/2020 at 09:39:04 (UTC).

Capps v. Lott et al

Case Summary

On 10/06/2020 Capps filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Lott. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott D. Johnson and Brian A. Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00670

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

Presiding Judge

Brian A. Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tanya D. Capps

Defendants

Bradley D. Lott

Prime Insurance Company

S&B Trucking, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Aub A. Ward

Attorney at Naquin & Ward

8034 Jefferson Hwy

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Defendant Attorneys

Raven Ann Fielding

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister & Weinstock

3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Ste. 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Rachel Marie Anderson

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Pfister, Weinstock & Bogart APLC

3838 North Causeway Boulevard Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

Joseph G. Glass

Attorney at Duplass, Zwain, Bourgeois, Morton, Pfister & Weinstock

Three Lakeway Center, 3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2900

Metairie, LA 70002

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #3

Certificate of Service

1 #4

Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

4 #2

Proposed Pleading;

#6

#7

#8

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 12/31/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson. Status Report due by 12/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/14/2020. (KAH) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Prime Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Prime Holdings Insurance Services, Inc. for Prime Insurance Company. (Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by S&B Trucking, LLC (Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 10/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 MOTION to Substitute Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott D. Johnson on 10/7/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAH) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION(S) REFERRED: #4 MOTION to Substitute Answer . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Substitute Answer by Bradley D. Lott, Prime Insurance Company, S&B Trucking, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Bradley D. Lott, Prime Insurance Company, S&B Trucking, LLC.(Fielding, Raven) Modified on 10/7/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/7/2020) (ELW). Modified on 10/7/2020 as ordered by rec doc 5 (ELW). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Compliance With Removal Order by Bradley D. Lott, Prime Insurance Company, S&B Trucking, LLC (Fielding, Raven) Modified on 10/7/2020 to edit text. (EDC). (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th JDC, East Baton Rouge Parish, Case Number 698356. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2182848), filed by Prime Insurance Company, S&B Trucking, LLC, Bradley D. Lott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Fielding, Raven) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Prime Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raven Fielding

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph G. Glass