This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:33:50 (UTC).

Caplan v. SKY MOTEL, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Caplan filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against SKY MOTEL, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cecilia M. Altonaga and Jared M. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62985

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cecilia M. Altonaga

Referral Judge

Jared M. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Michael Caplan

Defendant

SKY MOTEL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald E. Stern

Attorney at The Advocacy Law Firm, P.A.

1250 East Hallandale Beach Boulevard, Suite 503

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

Defendant Attorney

Keith Thomas Grumer

Attorney at KATZ BARRON

100 N.E. Third Avenue, Suite 280

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Mediation Deadline 4/27/2020.) Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#20

(#20) ORDER denying #13 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#19

(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

13 #5

Exhibit E

13 #4

Exhibit D

13 #3

Exhibit C

13 #2

Exhibit B

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#13) Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SKY MOTEL, INC.. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#9

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#7

(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Thomas Grumer on behalf of SKY MOTEL, INC.. Attorney Keith Thomas Grumer added to party SKY MOTEL, INC.(pty:dft). (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

#5

(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/10/2020 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. SKY MOTEL, INC. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to SKY MOTEL, INC.. (mee) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • Docket(#22) Case Reassignment of Paired Magistrate Judge pursuant to Administrative Order(s) - 2020-5 to Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer no longer assigned to case. (jmd) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Mediation Deadline 4/27/2020.) Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER denying #13 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Howard Michael Caplan, #13 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by SKY MOTEL, INC. Replies due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #14 Order,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings, to Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Stay by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Howard Michael Caplan. Replies due by 1/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A: Division of Corporations and Broward County Property Appraiser Records)(Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Michael Caplan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER setting response/reply deadlines as to #13 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law: Responses due by 1/7/2020, Replies due by 1/8/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Defendant's MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Cross Inspections of the Facility for Review of Remediation Efforts & Incorporated Memorandum of Law by SKY MOTEL, INC.. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer due to the failure to submit a proposed order, as is required by the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by SKY MOTEL, INC.. (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Thomas Grumer on behalf of SKY MOTEL, INC.. Attorney Keith Thomas Grumer added to party SKY MOTEL, INC.(pty:dft). (Grumer, Keith) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report and certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 1/10/2020 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. SKY MOTEL, INC. served on 12/6/2019, answer due 12/27/2019. (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SKY MOTEL, INC.. (mee) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Barry S. Seltzer is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12201125, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.