This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 17:20:15 (UTC).

Caplan v. HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 Caplan filed a Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination lawsuit against HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Beth Bloom and Alicia O. Valle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:19-CV-62123

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Housing/Accommodation Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Bloom

Referral Judge

Alicia O. Valle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Michael Caplan

Defendants

PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC

HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.

HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. a Florida Profit Corporation doing business as CHASSIS MASTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald E. Stern

Attorney at The Advocacy Law Firm, P.A.

1250 East Hallandale Beach Boulevard, Suite 503

Hallandale Beach, FL 33009

Defendant Attorneys

Michael B. Buckley

Attorney at Buckley Law Group

150 Second Avenue N, Suite 1200

St. Petersburg, FL 33701

Carri S. Leininger

Attorney at Williams Leininger & Cosby

50 E Ocean Boulevard, Suite 203

Stuart, FL 34994-2222

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC (Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#22

(#22) Joint MOTION to Stay Case for Forty-Five Days Pending Early Settlement Discussions by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carri S. Leininger on behalf of HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#20

(#20) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2019., Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Fact Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2019., Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/19/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2020., Motions due by 2/19/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/11/2020., Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 5/19/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

#19

(#19) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#17

(#17) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Michael Caplan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

14 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#14

(#18) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. See ECF No. #17 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#10

(#23) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #22 Motion to Stay Case for Forty-Five Days Pending Early Settlement Discussions. The parties may engage in settlement discussions and the Court encourages same. Moreover, the parties may schedule an early mediation date and the Court encourages same. The Court's Order, ECF No. #10 , establishes another procedure for the parties to meaningfully evaluate the claims and defenses asserted. However, the parties shall adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order, ECF No. #20 , and there is no basis for a stay of the schedule imposed by the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Ronald E. Stern on behalf of Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#4

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Ronald E. Stern on behalf of Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

3 #1

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP., PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

1 #3

Summon(s)

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by All Defendants by September 30, 2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC (Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) PAPERLESS ORDER denying #22 Motion to Stay Case for Forty-Five Days Pending Early Settlement Discussions. The parties may engage in settlement discussions and the Court encourages same. Moreover, the parties may schedule an early mediation date and the Court encourages same. The Court's Order, ECF No. #10 , establishes another procedure for the parties to meaningfully evaluate the claims and defenses asserted. However, the parties shall adhere to the Court's Scheduling Order, ECF No. #20 , and there is no basis for a stay of the schedule imposed by the Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Joint MOTION to Stay Case for Forty-Five Days Pending Early Settlement Discussions by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.. Responses due by 10/30/2019 (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 10/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carri S. Leininger on behalf of HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2019., Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Fact Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2019., Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020., In Limine Motions due by 2/19/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2020., Motions due by 2/19/2020., Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/11/2020., Jury Trial set for 5/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 5/19/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. (Mediation Deadline 2/11/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. (Leininger, Carri) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. See ECF No. #17 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Howard Michael Caplan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Clerks Notice to Filer re #15 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (jas) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by All Defendants by September 30, 2019. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP., PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC. Attorney Michael B. Buckley added to party HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael B. Buckley added to party PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Buckley, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Howard Michael Caplan. HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP. served on 8/30/2019, answer due 9/20/2019. (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Ronald E. Stern on behalf of Howard Michael Caplan (Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES (Verified Certificate of Counsel due on or before September 3, 2019). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to HOLLYWOOD CHASSIS CORP., PIE IN THE SKY LAND HOLDINGS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s))(ebz) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11927171, filed by Howard Michael Caplan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Stern, Ronald) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less