This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2021 at 08:33:01 (UTC).

Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation v. Sober Living America, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/31/2021 Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sober Living America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03614

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas W. Thrash, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation

Defendants

Sober Living America, Inc.

General Star Indemnity Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Crighton Allen

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Nesuite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Alexandra Spear Peurach

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

600 Peachtree Street Nesuite 3000

Atlanta, GA 30308

Charles T. Blair

Attorney at Troutman Sanders, LLP-DC

Suite 1000401 9Th Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20004-2134

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibits -A -Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit -B -1st Amended Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit -C -2nd Amended Complaint

1 #4

Exhibit -D -Policy

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. General Star Indemnity Company waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Peurach, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. General Star Indemnity Company waiver mailed on 9/8/2021, answer due 11/8/2021. (Peurach, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Charles T. Blair. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/8/21. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(rlh) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons. Approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #5 APPLICATION for Admission of Charles T. Blair Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11233220).. Attorney Charles T. Blair added appearing on behalf of Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation (nmb) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Admission of Charles T. Blair Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-11233220).by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Peurach, Alexandra) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation identifying Other Affiliates: Capitol Indemnity Corporation, Alleghany Corporation, CapSpecialty, Inc. and Allegheny Insurance Holdings LLC for Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to General Star Indemnity Company. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Sober Living America, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Capitol Specialty Insurance Corporation. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC -11226943) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits -A -Complaint, #2 Exhibit -B -1st Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit -C -2nd Amended Complaint, #4 Exhibit -D -Policy, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sober Living America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GENERAL STAR INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Capitol Specialty Ins Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexandra Spear Peurach