This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2020 at 07:50:00 (UTC).

Capitol Indemnity Corporation v. Frison et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Capitol Indemnity Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Frison. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda R. Anderson and Henry T. Wingate. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00816

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Linda R. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Henry T. Wingate

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Capitol Indemnity Corporation

Defendants, Counter Defendants and Counter Claimants

Alex Terrell Johnson

Branford Frison

Royshandra Patrice Wilson

Brittany Gray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Stuart Moran

Attorney at PHELPS DUNBAR, LLP - Gulfport

2602 13Th Street, Suite 300

Gulfport, MS 39501

Defendant, Counter Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Jonathan P. Barrett

Attorney at BARRETT LAW, PLLC - Madison

121 Colony Crossing, Suite D

Madison, MS 39110

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Alex Terrell Johnson, Brittany Gray, Royshandra Patrice Wilson by Alex Terrell Johnson, Brittany Gray, Royshandra Patrice Wilson.(Barrett, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Royshandra Patrice Wilson served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson (Barrett, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Brittany Gray served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Alex Terrell Johnson served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Branford Frison, Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson, Royshandra Patrice Wilson. (cwl) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A - Certified Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Branford Frison, Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson, Royshandra Patrice Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4138205), filed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Alex Terrell Johnson, Brittany Gray, Royshandra Patrice Wilson by Alex Terrell Johnson, Brittany Gray, Royshandra Patrice Wilson.(Barrett, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Royshandra Patrice Wilson served on 12/30/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants Gray and Johnson are allowed until January 10, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint for Declaratory Judgment. NO FURTHER WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda R. Anderson on 1/2/2020 (Lewis, Nijah) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson (Barrett, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Brittany Gray served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. Alex Terrell Johnson served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Moran, Kyle) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Branford Frison, Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson, Royshandra Patrice Wilson. (cwl) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Branford Frison, Brittany Gray, Alex Terrell Johnson, Royshandra Patrice Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-4138205), filed by Capitol Indemnity Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(MGB) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.