This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2022 at 08:19:08 (UTC).

Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC et al v-Kevin Robl et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC v-Kevin Robl was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-07265

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sherilyn Peace Garnett

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC

THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC

Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd.

Defendants

Kevin Robl

PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC

Remington Chase

William Westwood

William Eliot

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank C. Salzano

Attorney at Salzano Lampert and Wilson LLP

275 Madison Avenue, 35Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

James Timothy Ryan

Attorney at Annigian Ryan LLP

114 North Indian Hill Boulevard Suite E

Claremont, CA 91711

Nicholas Allen Kurtz

Attorney at Annigian Ryan LLP

114 North Indian Hill Boulevard Suite E

Claremont, CA 91711

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Frank Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintifff Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, et al., designating James Ryan as local counsel #19 . (iv) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

(#19) Renewed APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/11/2022, Receipt No. 34129532) filed by Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#18

(#18) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Application of Non-Resident Attorney #16 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The document is stricken. (iv) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACAC #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order

#16

(#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34129532) filed by Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#15

(#15) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Frank Salzano on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Frank Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintifff Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, et al., designating James Ryan as local counsel #19 . (iv) (Entered: 10/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Renewed APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500.00 Previously Paid on 10/11/2022, Receipt No. 34129532) filed by Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Application of Non-Resident Attorney #16 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The document is stricken. (iv) (Entered: 10/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACAC #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Order has not been flattened and is causing a corruption with the filing. (lt) (Entered: 10/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Frank C. Salzano to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-34129532) filed by Plaintiffs Cambridge Sarnano, Ltd., Capital Providers of Cambridge Sarnano, LLC, The Final Investors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg) (Entered: 10/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Frank Salzano on behalf of Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Production Capital LLC. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Remington Chase. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Kevin Robl. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (et) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD, CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC, THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD, CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC, THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 filed by Plaintiffs CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD, CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC, THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD, CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC, THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Kevin Robl; Remington Chase (aka William Westwood, aka William Eliot; Production Capital LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD, CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC, THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC. (Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-34106300 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC, THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC, CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H) (Attorney Nicholas Allen Kurtz added to party CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LTD(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas Allen Kurtz added to party CAPITAL PROVIDERS OF CAMBRIDGE SARNANO, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nicholas Allen Kurtz added to party THE FINAL INVESTORS LLC(pty:pla))(Kurtz, Nicholas) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRODUCTION CAPITAL LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Timothy Ryan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Allen Kurtz