This case was last updated from PACER on 06/16/2020 at 10:16:23 (UTC).

Capellan v. West Maui Resort Partners, et al.

Case Summary

On 04/17/2020 Capellan filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against West Maui Resort Partners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT and ROM TRADER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00172

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT

Referral Judge

ROM TRADER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faye Lizette Capellan

Defendants

Doe Partnerships 1-5

Doe LLC 1-5

Doe Corporations 1-5

John Does 1-5

Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5

Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5

Diamond Resorts

Jane Does 1-5

West Maui Resort Parners, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Charles H. Brower

Attorney at Pioneer Plaza

900 Fort St Ste 1210, 526-2688, Fax: 526-0307

Honolulu, HI 96813

Michael P. Healy

1188 Bishop St Ste 3304, 525-8584

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorneys

Chelsea C. Maja

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

Nicholas R. Monlux

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

Gregory M. Sato

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

David M. Louie

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600, 535-5700, Fax: 535-5799

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

Chelsea Chizuko Maja

Attorney at Kobayashi Sugita & Goda

999 Bishop St Ste 2600

Honolulu, HI 96813-3889

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/18/2020. (jo) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#13

(#13) EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Parties engaged in settlement discussions.Telephone Conference set for 07/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Courtroom Manager to provide call-in information.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 08/17/2021 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/06/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 05/17/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference Statements due by 05/10/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 03/17/2021. Discovery due by 06/18/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

#11

(#11) Plaintiff Faye Lizette Capellan's Scheduling Conference Statement (Healy, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 5/13/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff Faye Lizette Capellan's DEMAND for Trial by Jury (Healy, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 5/13/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#9

(#9) Defendants West Maui Resort Partners, L.P. and Diamond Resorts' Scheduling Conference Statement . (Sato, Gregory) Docket Text Modified on 5/11/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#8

(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Filed October 21, 2019 by West Maui Resort Parners, L.P..(Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#7

(#7) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

6 #1

Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Resorts, West Maui Resort Parners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

5 #2

Case Detail Docket List

5 #1

Clerk's Certificate

#5

(#5) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CC191001650. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jni) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

1 #3

Declaration Declaration of Calder Huntington

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration Declaration of Gregory M. Sato

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maui West Resorts Partners, L.P.; Diamond Resorts, et al. from First Circuit, case number 19-1-1650-10 (BIA). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2360372), filed by Maui West Resorts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory M. Sato, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Calder Huntington, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/18/2020. (jo) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Parties engaged in settlement discussions.Telephone Conference set for 07/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Courtroom Manager to provide call-in information.Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 9:00 a.m. on 08/17/2021 in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 07/06/2021 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 05/17/2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 5 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference Statements due by 05/10/2021. Dispositive Motions filed by 03/17/2021. Discovery due by 06/18/2021. (Court Reporter No Record.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docket(#12) EO: Court advances Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set 05/18/2020 at 9:00 a.m. to 8:45 a.m. on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. In accordance with the Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency, issued on April 16, 2020 by Chief District Judge Seabright, until further court order or notice, all proceedings before Magistrate Judge Trader will be conducted by telephone or other electronic means. Call-in information for the Rule 16 Scheduling conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Participants to call in per the instructions below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code (2070326) when prompted followed by the pound (#) sign.3. Message will say "To join the conference as host press star (*) otherwise press pound (#).4. Press pound (#). Message will say "The host has not yet arrived, please standby".5. You will hear "At the tone state your name." You will then be connected to the Conference. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(jp) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Plaintiff Faye Lizette Capellan's Scheduling Conference Statement (Healy, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 5/13/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff Faye Lizette Capellan's DEMAND for Trial by Jury (Healy, Michael) Docket Text Modified on 5/13/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendants West Maui Resort Partners, L.P. and Diamond Resorts' Scheduling Conference Statement . (Sato, Gregory) Docket Text Modified on 5/11/2020 (jo) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint Filed October 21, 2019 by West Maui Resort Parners, L.P..(Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 05/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diamond Resorts, West Maui Resort Parners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CC191001650. (Attachments: #1 Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jni) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Diamond Resorts re #1 Notice of Removal, (Amended Certificate of Service) (Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 5/18/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00172 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Maui West Resorts Partners, L.P.; Diamond Resorts, et al. from First Circuit, case number 19-1-1650-10 (BIA). ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2360372), filed by Maui West Resorts. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gregory M. Sato, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of Calder Huntington, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sato, Gregory) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where West Maui Resorts Partners, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Diamond Resorts Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David M. Louie