This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/17/2021 at 10:32:21 (UTC).

Capbran Holdings, LLC et al v. Glanbia PLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Capbran Holdings, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Glanbia PLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Philip S. Gutierrez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01382

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Capbran Holdings, LLC

Nutribullet, LLC

Defendants

Glanbia PLC

Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd

Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc.

Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dylan C Dang

Attorney at Trojan Law Offices

9250 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 325

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Francis Wong

Attorney at Trojan Law Offices

9250 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 325

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

R Joseph Trojan

Attorney at Trojan Law Offices

9250 Wilshire Blvd., Ste 325

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorney

Deborah Anne Hedley

Attorney at Vedder Price LLP

1925 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#10

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Having read and Defendants Glanbia PLC, Glanbia Nutritionals (Ireland) Limited, Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited, and Glanbia Performance Nutrition (NA), Inc. and Plaintiffs CAPBRAN HOLDINGS, LLC and NUTRIBULLET, LLC STIPULATION TO FURTHER EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT, the Court orders the same is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint no later than May 11, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. (yl) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd, Glanbia PLC, Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited, Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hedley, Deborah) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited answer now due 4/11/2021; Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd answer now due 4/11/2021; Glanbia PLC answer now due 4/11/2021; Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc. answer now due 4/11/2021, filed by Defendants Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited; Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd; Glanbia PLC; Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc..(Attorney Deborah Anne Hedley added to party Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah Anne Hedley added to party Glanbia PLC(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah Anne Hedley added to party Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah Anne Hedley added to party Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hedley, Deborah) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Capbran Holdings, LLC, Nutribullet, LLC, upon Defendant Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Glanbia PLC served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021; Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc. served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tiffany Phillips, Agent, Corporate Creations Network, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING OF PROOFS OF SERVICE ON ALL DEFENDANTS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Trojan, R) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants Glanbia Nutritionals Ireland Ltd, Glanbia PLC, Glanbia Performance Nutrition Limited, Glanbia Performance Nutrition NA, Inc. (lh) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Capbran Holdings, LLC, NUTRIBULLET, LLC. (Trojan, R) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURES and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Capbran Holdings, LLC, NUTRIBULLET, LLC, identifying 1.Capbran Holdings, LLC, a California limited liability company; 2.NutriBullet, LLC, a California limited liability company; 3.Capital Brands, LLC, a California limited liability company; 4.Capital Brands Holdings, Inc., a Delaware corporation;. (Trojan, R) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Capbran Holdings, LLC, NUTRIBULLET, LLC. (Trojan, R) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-30558563 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Capbran Holdings, LLC, NUTRIBULLET, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Attorney R Joseph Trojan added to party Capbran Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney R Joseph Trojan added to party NUTRIBULLET, LLC(pty:pla))(Trojan, R) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less