This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2020 at 14:53:31 (UTC).

CAO LIGHTING, INC. v. OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2020 CAO LIGHTING, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00690

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAO LIGHTING, INC.

Defendants

LEDVANCE LLC

OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chad S.C. Stover

Defendant Attorney

Adam V. Orlacchio

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

#8

#7

6 #2

Exhibit B

6 #1

Exhibit A

#6

5 #1

Summons

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to August 3, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: LEDVANCE LLC answer due 8/3/2020; OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. answer due 8/3/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/17/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint to August 3, 2020 - filed by LEDVANCE LLC, OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. (Orlacchio, Adam) Modified on 7/17/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 17, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: LEDVANCE LLC answer due 7/17/2020; OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. answer due 7/17/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/11/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to July 17, 2020 - filed by LEDVANCE LLC, OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. (McCune, Brandon) Modified on 6/11/2020 (dlw). (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO LIGHTING, INC.. LEDVANCE LLC served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO LIGHTING, INC.. OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. served on 5/27/2020, answer due 6/17/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00681-MN, 1:20-cv-00690-MN (rjb) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against LEDVANCE LLC, OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.- filed by CAO LIGHTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued as to OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. and LEDVANCE LLC on 5/26/2020. (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (Attachments: #1 Summons) (lak) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CAO Group, Inc. for CAO LIGHTING, INC. filed by CAO LIGHTING, INC.. (lak) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,465,961. (lak) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (lak) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT - filed with Jury Demand against LEDVANCE LLC, OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2947703.) - filed by CAO LIGHTING, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (lak) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less