This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2020 at 10:27:16 (UTC).

CAO Lighting, Inc. v. GE Lighting, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2020 CAO Lighting, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against GE Lighting, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00681

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CAO Lighting, Inc.

Defendants

GE Lighting, Inc.

General Electric Company

Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC doing business as GE Lighting

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chad S.C. Stover

Todd G. Vare

Paul B. Hunt

Defendant Attorneys

Alexandra M. Joyce

Michael P. Kelly

Daniel M. Silver

 

Court Documents

#12

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to through and including Monday, August 3, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC answer due 8/3/2020; GE Lighting, Inc. answer due 8/3/2020; General Electric Company answer due 8/3/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to through and including Monday, August 3, 2020 (from Monday, July 13, 2020) - filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arthur P. Licygiewicz filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arthur P. Licygiewicz - filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to July 13, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC answer due 7/13/2020; GE Lighting, Inc. answer due 7/13/2020; General Electric Company answer due 7/13/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Deadline to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to July 13, 2020 - filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Paul B. Hunt,Todd G. Vare for CAO Lighting, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd G. Vare and Paul B. Hunt filed by CAO Lighting, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/27/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00681-MN, 1:20-cv-00690-MN (rjb) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd G. Vare and Paul B. Hunt - filed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Todd G. Vare), #2 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Paul B. Hunt))(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. General Electric Company served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. GE Lighting, Inc. served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CAO Group, Inc. for CAO Lighting, Inc. filed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,465,961 ;6,634,770. (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2942376.) - filed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less