1:20-CV-00681
05/20/2020
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Patent
Maryellen Noreika
CAO Lighting, Inc.
GE Lighting, Inc.
General Electric Company
Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC doing business as GE Lighting
Chad S.C. Stover
Todd G. Vare
Paul B. Hunt
Alexandra M. Joyce
Michael P. Kelly
Daniel M. Silver
Civil Cover Sheet
Exhibit D
Exhibit C
Exhibit B
Exhibit A
DocketSO ORDERED re #12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to through and including Monday, August 3, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC answer due 8/3/2020; GE Lighting, Inc. answer due 8/3/2020; General Electric Company answer due 8/3/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#12) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to through and including Monday, August 3, 2020 (from Monday, July 13, 2020) - filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketSO ORDERED re #11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arthur P. Licygiewicz filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 7/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#11) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Arthur P. Licygiewicz - filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel)(Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketSO ORDERED re #10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to July 13, 2020 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC answer due 7/13/2020; GE Lighting, Inc. answer due 7/13/2020; General Electric Company answer due 7/13/2020). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 6/10/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#10) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Deadline to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint to July 13, 2020 - filed by Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company. (Silver, Daniel) (Entered: 06/09/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Paul B. Hunt,Todd G. Vare for CAO Lighting, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (mal) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketSO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd G. Vare and Paul B. Hunt filed by CAO Lighting, Inc. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/27/2020. (dlw) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
[-] Read LessDocketCase Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-00681-MN, 1:20-cv-00690-MN (rjb) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Todd G. Vare and Paul B. Hunt - filed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Todd G. Vare), #2 Certification by Counsel to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (Paul B. Hunt))(Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/22/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. General Electric Company served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. GE Lighting, Inc. served on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. (Stover, Chad) (Entered: 05/21/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent CAO Group, Inc. for CAO Lighting, Inc. filed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,465,961 ;6,634,770. (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
[-] Read LessDocket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Consumer Lighting (U.S.), LLC, GE Lighting, Inc., General Electric Company - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ADEDC-2942376.) - filed by CAO Lighting, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 05/20/2020)
[-] Read Less